Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. v. Capsol-EoP AS et al
Plaintiff: Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Capsol-EoP AS and CO2 Capsol AS
Case Number: 1:2022cv00982
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 256 Patent Non-Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File; ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Monday, December 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/24/2022. (jlan)
October 21, 2022 Filing 21 Waiver of re #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Joint Waiver of Hearing) by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. (Erbach, John)
October 21, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Erbach, John)
October 21, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Smith on behalf of CO2 Capsol AS, Capsol-EoP AS (Smith, Stephen)
October 14, 2022 Filing 18 Declaration of Service of Process by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (Erbach, John)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve the Summons and Complaint in this action, together with a copy of this Order, on Defendant Capsol-EoP AS, by email directed to Defendant Capsol-EoP AS's Norwegian counsel Johan Svedberg at the law firm CMS Kluge Advokatfirma AS (johan.svedberg@cms-kluge.com) and Defendant Capsol-EoP /AS's U.S. patent counsel Paul Lewis at the law firm Birch, Stewart, Kolasch & Birch, LLP (pel(@bskb.com); and it is further ORDERED that the hearing set for October 7, 2022 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/4/2022. (nneb, )
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Clay Sutton Hester on behalf of Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. (Hester, Clay)
September 30, 2022 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293 (clar, )
September 30, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293 . Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
September 30, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date of October 7, 2022 at 10:00 AM re #13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293 (Erbach, John)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293 filed by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Hurd, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Erbach, John)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION Alternative Service of Process Under 35 U.S.C. 293 by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Version A), #2 Proposed Order (Version B))(Erbach, John)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Todd Adrian Gangel for Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/31/2022. (nneb)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Michael Bryan Hurd for Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/31/2022. (nneb)
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd Adrian Gangel and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8547462. by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (McDaniel, Dana)
August 30, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bryan Hurd and Certification of Local Counsel Dana D. McDaniel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8547445. by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (McDaniel, Dana)
August 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. Report Regarding Patent and Trademark (McDaniel, Dana)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CO2 Capsol AS, Capsol-EoP AS, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit)(kgall)
August 29, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (kgall)
August 29, 2022 Notice of Correction: Counsel notified via email to refile document 1-4. Filing is labeled as USPTO Notice but instead is a financial disclosure. (kgall)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Bascom on behalf of Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. (Bascom, Christopher)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Erbach on behalf of Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. (Erbach, John)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (McDaniel, Dana)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for CO2 Capsol AS by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (McDaniel, Dana)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Capsol-EoP AS by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (McDaniel, Dana)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8543308.), filed by Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 USPTO Notice of Suit)(McDaniel, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc. v. Capsol-EoP AS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eickmeyer & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher William Bascom
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Represented By: Dana Duane McDaniel
Represented By: Clay Sutton Hester
Represented By: Michael B Hurd
Represented By: Todd Gangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capsol-EoP AS
Represented By: Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO2 Capsol AS
Represented By: Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?