THE Chowns Group, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Chowns Group, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv01146
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Charles D. Mandracchia for The Chowns Group, LLC. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/1/2022. (nneb)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jeffrey W. Soderberg for The Chowns Group, LLC. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/1/2022. (nneb)
December 1, 2022 Filing 28 Reply to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Mason, Arnie)
November 29, 2022 Filing 27 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles D. Mandracchia and Certification of Local Counsel James P. Campbell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8681755. by The Chowns Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Personal Statement)(Campbell, James)
November 29, 2022 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey W. Soderberg and Certification of Local Counsel James. Campbell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8681511. by The Chowns Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Personal Statement/Proposed Order)(Campbell, James)
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Campbell on behalf of The Chowns Group, LLC (Campbell, James)
November 25, 2022 Filing 24 Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed) filed by The Chowns Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, James)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #21 ) is SCHEDULED for Thursday, December 15, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/22/2022. (tran)
November 22, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed). Motion Hearing reset for 12/15/2022 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tran)
November 21, 2022 Set Deadline as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed). Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (wgar, )
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Hearing Date re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed) (Mason, Arnie)
November 17, 2022 Notice of Correction re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed) The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (nneb)
November 11, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Renewed) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mason, Arnie)
November 11, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of Sam Warshawer (Mason, Arnie)
November 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of Michael Bonner (Mason, Arnie)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Herman M. Braude for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/10/2022. (nneb)
November 8, 2022 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Herman M. Braude and Certification of Local Counsel Arnie B. Mason Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8649686. by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Mason, Arnie)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that defendant is DIRECTED to file a renewed motion to dismiss or other responsive pleading on or before Friday, November 18, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/04/2022. (tran)
November 4, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Mason, Arnie)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arnie Mason on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Mason, Arnie)
October 12, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-02275. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AS TO IMPROPER VENUE AND DENIED AS TO FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. THIS CASE IS HEREBY ORDERED TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1406(A). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/7/22. 10/7/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/7/22. 10/7/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 entry of appearance, #3 entry of appearance, #4 affidavit, #5 notice of removal)(afm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BONNER, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/6/22. 7/6/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND CCP MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF) filed by THE CHOWNS GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SODERBERG, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S #5 MOTION FOR THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF HERMAN M. BRAUDE, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/22/22.6/22/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15997314.) filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BONNER, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SAM L. WARSHAWER, JR on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(WARSHAWER, SAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit #1, #4 Exhibit #2, #5 Exhibit #3, #6 Exhibit #4, #7 Certificate of Service)(BONNER, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BONNER, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15973561), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BONNER, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/12/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE Chowns Group, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Chowns Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Soderberg
Represented By: James P. Campbell
Represented By: Charles D. Mandracchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael E. Bonner
Represented By: Herman M. Braude
Represented By: Sam L. Warshawer, Jr
Represented By: Arnie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?