American Farm Bureau Federation et al v. Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual et al
Plaintiff: American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation and Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh and Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh
Case Number: 1:2024cv00213
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh,and Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh (Sbro, )
April 5, 2024 Filing 16 Request for Entry of Default as to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh, and Virginia Farm Bureau Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2024: #1 Declaration in Support) (Sbro, ). Modified to separate attachment from main document on 4/9/2024 (Sbro, ).
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh on March 4, 2024, filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2024 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh on February 22, 2024, filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual on March 4, 2024, filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Compliance Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sbro)
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 Certificate of Compliance Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Sbro)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Douglas Anthony Rettew for American Farm Bureau Federation,Douglas Anthony Rettew for Virginia Farm Bureau Federation,Douglas Anthony Rettew for Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 2/27/2024. (swil)
February 27, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Anthony Rettew and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth D. Ferrill Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9385392. by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. (Sbro) Modified on 3/19/2024 (Sbro).
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Sbro)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 Proposed Summons CORRECTED to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 15, 2024 Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to provide an address on the summons re #3 Proposed Summons to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh (Sbro)
February 13, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Sbro)
February 13, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Ferrill, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9360866.), filed by American Farm Bureau Federation, Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Virginia Farm Bureau Federation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificates, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferrill, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Farm Bureau Federation et al v. Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Elizabeth D Ferrill
Represented By: Douglas Anthony Rettew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Elizabeth D Ferrill
Represented By: Douglas Anthony Rettew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth D Ferrill
Represented By: Douglas Anthony Rettew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins c/o Margaret Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Ins Corp c/o Margaret Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?