Yang v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Zinan Yang
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate irector Connie Nolan, Ur M Jaddou, Connie Nolan and Ur M. Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2024cv00666
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zinan Yang. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/16/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zinan Yang. Connie Nolan served on 5/7/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on US Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia on 5/6/2024, filed by Zinan Yang. (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on US Attorney General on 5/6/2024, filed by Zinan Yang. (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zinan Yang. Ur M. Jaddou served on 5/2/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ur M Jaddou, Connie Nolan, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Cwel)
April 23, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Cwel)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for USCIS by Zinan Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Connie Nolan, #2 Proposed Summons - Ur Jaddou, #3 Proposed Summons - US Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons - US Attorney for EDVA)(Sharbaugh, Matthew)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $ 405.), filed by Zinan Yang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharbaugh, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinan Yang
Represented By: Matthew James Sharbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate irector Connie Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?