Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited v. Evgeny Vasilyevich
Plaintiff: Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited
Defendant: Evgeny Vasilyevich
Case Number: 1:2024cv01146
Filed: July 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Evgeny Vasilyevich (swil)
August 20, 2024 Filing 10 Request for Entry of Default as to by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Attison)
August 5, 2024 Filing 9 Declaration re #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Barnes, Attison)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 MOTION Alternative Service (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/17/2024. (swil)
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David Edison Weslow for Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/10/2024. (swil)
July 10, 2024 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Weslow and Certification of Local Counsel Attison Barnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9622955. by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Barnes, Attison)
July 10, 2024 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION Alternative Service by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited (Barnes, Attison)
July 10, 2024 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION Alternative Service filed by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Barnes, Attison)
July 10, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION Alternative Service by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
July 8, 2024 Case Reassigned to District Judge Anthony J Trenga. District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
July 3, 2024 No service issued at this time. (Cwel)
July 2, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Cwel)
July 2, 2024 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Barnes, Attison)
July 2, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9612413.), filed by Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited v. Evgeny Vasilyevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamaris (Gibraltar) Limited
Represented By: David Edison Weslow
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evgeny Vasilyevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?