Chantilly Auto Body, Inc. v. Truist Bank et al
Plaintiff: CHANTILLY AUTO BODY, INC.
Defendant: PAYSTAND, INC. and Truist Bank
Cross-Defendant: Evolve Bank & Trust, Comenity Capital Bank and CASS Commercial Bank
Cross-Plaintiff: Truist Bank
Case Number: 1:2024cv01337
Filed: August 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Brian L. Moffet for Truist Bank,Brian L. Moffet for Truist Bank. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/26/2024. (swil)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian L. Moffet and Certification of Local Counsel Jessica L. Duvall Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9762704. by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Federal District Court Admissions List)(Duvall, Jessica)
September 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Third Party Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to CASS Commercial Bank, Comenity Capital Bank, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Proposed Summons re #40 Third Party Complaint Comenity Capital Bank and CASS Commercial Bank by Truist Bank. (Duvall, Jessica)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Amended Third Party Complaint against Evolve Bank & Trust, Comenity Capital Bank, CASS Commercial Bank, filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redline Complaint)(Duvall, Jessica)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons for Third-Party Complaint filed by Truist Bank served on Evolve Bank & Trust on 09/18/2024, filed by Truist Bank. (Duvall, Jessica)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Third Party Summons Issued as to Evolve Bank & Trust. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm) Modified to correct text on 9/17/2024 (dvanm).
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Proposed Summons re #35 Third Party Complaint Against Evolve Bank and Trust by Truist Bank (Duvall, Jessica)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Third Party Complaint against Evolve Bancorp, Inc., filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Duvall, Jessica)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Paystand, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Proposed Summons to Defendant Paystand, Inc. by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc. (Devinney, William)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Joint Discovery Plan is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 9/11/2024. (nneb)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that the Motion be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and Counts II and III are hereby dismissed; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant Evolve be, and hereby is, terminated as a Party to this action in re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/11/2024. (swil)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2024. Appearances of counsel. Deft #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is argued and GRANTED as to Counts II and III. (Order to follow) (Court Reporter R. Stonestreet.)(yguy)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/11/2024. Appearance of counsel for plaintiff and defendants. Discovery Plan approved in part. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(nneb)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Electronic Device Application only as to Motion Hearing in Courtroom 900 on September 11, 2024. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/10/2024. (dvanm)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Morgan, Joel)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 09/10/2024. (dvanm)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc.. (Devinney, William)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 9/11/2024 at 11:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. The parties are directed to proceed to Courtroom 501 following the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (wgar, )
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc..(Devinney, William)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the Motion #22 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and the hearing is hereby rescheduled to Wednesday, September 11, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/3/2024. (dzir)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing reset for 9/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 9/11/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Miller, Diana)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that the parties file their proposed joint discovery plan by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, September 5, 2024. It is further ORDERED that the Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference will be rescheduled to Wednesday, September 11, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 08/29/2024. (dvanm)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Miller, Diana)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc.. (Devinney, William)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Paystand, Inc. by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Melody McAnally for Evolve Bancorp, Inc. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/21/2024. (swil)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melody McAnally and Certification of Local Counsel Diana M. Miller Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9695762. by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Miller, Diana)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Set Deadline as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (triv)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date set for 9/4/2024 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Miller, Diana)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 8/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Corrected filed by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Diana)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Diana)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Evolve Bancorp, Inc.. (Miller, Diana)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Truist Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Truist Bank.(Duvall, Jessica)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Wayne Morgan on behalf of Evolve Bancorp, Inc. (Morgan, Joel)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Chantilly Auto Body, Inc.. (Cox, Robert)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Devinney on behalf of Chantilly Auto Body, Inc. (Devinney, William)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Cox on behalf of Chantilly Auto Body, Inc. (Cox, Robert)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Truist Bank. (Duvall, Jessica)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Maria Miller on behalf of EVOLVE BANCORP, INC. (Miller, Diana)
August 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Cwel)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EVOLVE BANCORP, INC.. (Morgan, Joel)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank. (Duvall, Jessica)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal JOINT NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9664216.), filed by Truist Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duvall, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chantilly Auto Body, Inc. v. Truist Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANTILLY AUTO BODY, INC.
Represented By: William Devinney
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Aiken
Represented By: Robert H. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAYSTAND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Duvall
Represented By: Brian L. Moffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Evolve Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: CASS Commercial Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-plaintiff: Truist Bank
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Duvall
Represented By: Brian L. Moffet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?