Kammerer v. Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Tamara L. Kammerer
Defendant: Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC doing business as August Healthcare at Iliff and Dunn Loring Propco, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01369
Filed: August 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Waiver of Oral Argument Notice of Motion to Amend in re #19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Tamara L. Kammerer. (Downey, Jeffrey) Modified to correct docket event on 10/4/2024 (swil).
October 4, 2024 Notice of Correction re #19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the Notice of Hearing separately. (swil)
October 3, 2024 Filing 19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Tamara L. Kammerer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Downey, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re: the handling and labeling of confidential information (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 09/18/2024. (dvanm)
September 18, 2024 Filing 17 First MOTION for Protective Order by Tamara L. Kammerer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Downey, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that together with the Court's Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 7), this Order shall control discovery unless further modified by the Court (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 8/28/2024. (nneb)
August 28, 2024 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/28/2024 by telephone. Appearance of counsel for plaintiff and defendants. Discovery Plan approved in part. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(nneb)
August 27, 2024 Filing 14 The Parties Joint Proposed Discovery Plan Discovery Plan by Tamara L. Kammerer.(Downey, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2024 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 8/28/2024 at 11:30 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 It is hereby ORDERED that the parties file their joint discovery plan by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, August 28, 2024. It is further ORDERED that the Rule 16(b) initial pretrial conference will be rescheduled to Wednesday, September 4, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 8/26/2024. (nneb)
August 26, 2024 Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 9/4/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Pre-Trial Conference Date (Dkt. No. 9) is GRANTED IN PART. The close of discovery shall be extended from December 13, 2024 to January 10, 2025 and the Final Pretrial Conference shall be rescheduled from December 19, 2024 to January 16, 2025, The Initial Pretrial Conference date set forth in the Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 7) shall remain unchanged. The Joint Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 08/21/2024. (dvanm) Modified to correct text on 9/9/2024 (dvanm).
August 21, 2024 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Per order ECF 12. (dvanm)
August 20, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Dunn Loring Propco, LLC, Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC re #9 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline and Pre-Trial Conference Date (proposed Order) (Phillips, Michael)
August 19, 2024 Filing 10 EXHIBIT (proposed Order) by Dunn Loring Propco, LLC, Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC.. (Phillips, Michael)
August 19, 2024 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery Deadline and Pre-Trial Conference Date by Dunn Loring Propco, LLC, Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
August 9, 2024 Filing 8 Response Plaintiff Expert Certification filed by Tamara L. Kammerer. (Downey, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Discovery due by 12/13/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/9/24. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
August 8, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dunn Loring Propco, LLC.(Phillips, Michael)
August 8, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC.(Phillips, Michael)
August 7, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUNN LORING PROPCO, LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
August 7, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DUNN LORING VA OPCO LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
August 7, 2024 Filing 2 Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by DUNN LORING PROPCO, LLC, DUNN LORING VA OPCO LLC. (Phillips, Michael)
August 7, 2024 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9671938.), filed by DUNN LORING PROPCO, LLC, DUNN LORING VA OPCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Michael)
August 7, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Cwel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kammerer v. Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn Loring VA Opco LLC doing business as August Healthcare at Iliff
Represented By: Michael E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn Loring Propco, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara L. Kammerer
Represented By: Jeffrey John Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?