Abu Irshaid et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Osama Abu Irshaid and Mustafa Zeidan
Defendant: Antony Blinken, Kenneth L. Wainstein, Mason Clutter, Peter Winn, Shoba Wadhia, Christopher Wray, Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, Brett Holmgren, UR M. Jaddou, Matthew G. Olsen, David Pekoske, Johnathan Meyer, Troy Miller, Shonnie Lyon, Merrick Garland, Susan Davies, Kelli Ann Burriesci, Michael Glasheen, Ronald Rowe, Avril Haines, Hillary Batier Johnson, Lloyd Austin, Paul Nakasone, Scott Berrier, Pete Buttigieg, Himamauli Das, Andrea Gacki and William Burns
Case Number: 1:2024cv01405
Filed: August 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: William B Porter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Objections to Subpoena Issued
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mustafa Zeidan, Osama Abu Irshaid Lloyd Austin served 9/12/2024; Hillary Batier Johnson served 9/12/2024; Scott Berrier served 9/12/2024; Antony Blinken served 9/12/2024; William Burns served 9/12/2024; Kelli Ann Burriesci served 9/12/2024; Pete Buttigieg served 9/12/2024; Mason Clutter served 9/12/2024; Himamauli Das served 9/12/2024; Susan Davies served 9/12/2024; Andrea Gacki served 9/12/2024; Merrick Garland served 9/12/2024; Michael Glasheen served 9/12/2024; Avril Haines served 9/12/2024; Brett Holmgren served 9/12/2024; UR M. Jaddou served 9/12/2024; Patrick Lechleitner served 9/12/2024; Shonnie Lyon served 9/12/2024; Alejandro Mayorkas served 9/12/2024; Johnathan Meyer served 9/12/2024; Troy Miller served 9/12/2024; Paul Nakasone served 9/12/2024; Matthew G. Olsen served 9/12/2024; Ronald Rowe served 9/12/2024; Shoba Wadhia served 9/12/2024; Kenneth L. Wainstein served 9/12/2024; Peter Winn served 9/12/2024; Christopher Wray served 9/12/2024. Answer due November 12, 2024 (Masri, Lena) Modified to correct text on 10/9/2024 (dvanm).
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Dina Chehata for Mustafa Zeidan. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 8/19/2024. (swil)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Amr Shabaik for Mustafa Zeidan. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 8/19/2024. (swil)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Lloyd Austin, Hillary Batier Johnson, Scott Berrier, Antony Blinken, William Burns, Kelli Ann Burriesci, Pete Buttigieg, Mason Clutter, Himamauli Das, Susan Davies, Andrea Gacki, Merrick Garland, Michael Glasheen, Avril Haines, Brett Holmgren, UR M. Jaddou, Patrick Lechleitner, Shonnie Lyon, Alejandro Mayorkas, Johnathan Meyer, Troy Miller, Paul Nakasone, Matthew G. Olsen, David Pekoske, Ronald Rowe, Shoba Wadhia, Kenneth L. Wainstein, Peter Winn, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney) (Dest)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan (Masri, Lena)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #7 Proposed Summons. Unfortunately, the document was filed without proposed summons to U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia. The Clerk's office is unable to issue the summons at this time. Please file proposed summons to U.S. Attorney Office for the Eastern District of Virginia. (Dest)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan (Masri, Lena)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dina Chehata and Certification of Local Counsel Lena Masri Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9680973. by Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan. (Masri, Lena)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amr Shabaik and Certification of Local Counsel Lena Masri Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9680965. by Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan. (Masri, Lena)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (dvanm)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas on behalf of Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan (Abbas, Gadeir)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Mark Sadowsky on behalf of Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan (Sadowsky, Justin)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lena F. Masri on behalf of Osama Abu Irshaid, Mustafa Zeidan (Masri, Lena)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9678838.), filed by Mustafa Zeidan, Osama Abu Irshaid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Masri, Lena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abu Irshaid et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Wainstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Clutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoba Wadhia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Holmgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonnie Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Ann Burriesci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glasheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avril Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Batier Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nakasone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Berrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buttigieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Himamauli Das
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Gacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osama Abu Irshaid
Represented By: Lena F. Masri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Zeidan
Represented By: Lena F. Masri
Represented By: Dina Chehata
Represented By: Amr Shabaik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?