Vasquez Castaneda v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security and Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2024cv01419
Filed: August 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ian Austin Rose for Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/27/2024. (swil)
September 27, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Austin Rose and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9764880. by Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda. (Appelbaum, Adina)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Discovery due by 2/14/2025. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 09/20/24. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(pmil, )
September 16, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Mezger, Matthew)
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/11/2024. (swil)
August 19, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda. Department of Homeland Security served on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Delivery Confirmation)(Appelbaum, Adina)
August 19, 2024 Case Reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (swil)
August 14, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Cwel)
August 14, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda (Appelbaum, Adina)
August 14, 2024 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Appelbaum, Adina) Modified to correct docket event on 8/15/2024 (swil).
August 13, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Cwel)
August 13, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit B, ICE Receipt of FOIA Request)(Appelbaum, Adina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez Castaneda v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Vasquez Castaneda
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Represented By: Ian Austin Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?