Fedoroff et al v. Buchman
Plaintiff: Melissa Fedoroff and A F
Defendant: Sarah E Buchman
Case Number: 1:2024cv01828
Filed: October 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William B Porter
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/9/2025. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
December 12, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (#11 - Amended Complaint) by Sarah E Buchman.(Bonafede, Giovanna)
December 12, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT A.F., a minor, by her next friend Melissa Fedoroff against Sarah E Buchman, filed by Melissa Fedoroff, A F.(Bertram, Catherine)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 13, 2024. No further extensions will be granted re #9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 12/5/2024. (Sbro, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Sarah E Buchman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonafede, Giovanna)
November 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew William Lee on behalf of Sarah E Buchman (Lee, Matthew)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before December 5, 2024 re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 11/25/2024. (Sbro, )
November 22, 2024 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sarah E Buchman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonafede, Giovanna)
November 8, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Sarah E. Buchman, M.D. on 11/04/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. filed by Melissa Fedoroff. (Bertram, Catherine) Modified on 11/12/2024 (Sbro, ).
October 25, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sarah E Buchman, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Sbro, )
October 23, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Melissa Fedoroff (Molster, Charles) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/25/2024) (Sbro, ).
October 21, 2024 No service issued at this time. (Cwel)
October 16, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
October 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Melissa Fedoroff (Molster, Charles)
October 16, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9796073.), filed by Melissa Fedoroff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bertram, Catherine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/21/2024) (Cwel, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedoroff et al v. Buchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Fedoroff
Represented By: Catherine Bertram
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A F
Represented By: Catherine Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah E Buchman
Represented By: Giovanna Bonafede
Represented By: Matthew William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?