Federico et al v. Lincoln Military Housing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joe Federico and Shelley Federico
Defendant: Lincoln Military Housing, LLC, Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities LLC and LPC Property Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00080
Filed: February 10, 2012
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Norfolk City
Presiding Judge: Robert G. Doumar
Referring Judge: F. Bradford Stillman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 1017 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 988 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs $4,500 in attorneys' fees within THIRTY (30)DAYS of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 8/31/16. (tbro)
August 23, 2016 1015 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 994 Motion for New Trial. Please see order for details. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 8/23/16. (tbro)
December 31, 2014 405 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 309 Motion for Sanctions. The Plaintiffs shall bear the cost of expert production of electronic media in the amount of $29,220.04. (ECF No. 372-1, at 3). The court shall also award a portion of the fees incurred by the Defendants in bringing the Motion to Compel after evaluating the facts required by Rule 37(a)(5)(A). To the extent Defendants' motion sought other or further relief, it is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 12/31/14. (tbro)
August 13, 2014 325 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 MOTION to QUASH AND/OR LIMIT SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO LOCAL TV. LLC, D/B/A WTKR TELEVISION, AND LAURIE SIMMONS AND OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 8/13/14. (tbro)
September 25, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/25/13. (afar)
October 3, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER - the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Consolidate and hereby CONSOLIDATES the above-captioned cases for the purposes of pre-trial motions, discovery, and possible fault. The Court will handle these matters separately for the purpose of determining damages. The Court further ORDERS the Clerk of Court to assign 2:12cv466 currently assigned to the Honorable Raymond Jackson to the Honorable Robert G. Doumar. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 10/3/2012. (bnew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federico et al v. Lincoln Military Housing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Federico
Represented By: David Sanburg Bailey
Represented By: Tammy L. Belinsky
Represented By: Jennifer Alettia French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Federico
Represented By: David Sanburg Bailey
Represented By: Tammy L. Belinsky
Represented By: Jennifer Alettia French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Military Housing, LLC
Represented By: Connie Nora Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities LLC
Represented By: Connie Nora Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPC Property Management, Inc.
Represented By: Connie Nora Bertram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?