DietGoal Innovations LLC v. Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.

Plaintiff: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Defendant: Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00154
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Tommy E. Miller
Presiding Judge: Raymond A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2015 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINIION AND ORDER: denying 149 MOTION to Declare this Case Exceptional Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Join Additional Parties to Defendants' Request Under 35 U.S.C. § 285 by Domino's Pizza, Inc. ; denying 159 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Motion for an Exceptional Case Finding Under 35 U.S.C. § 285, for Attorney's Fees, and to Join Plaintiff's Principals) by General Mills Sales, Inc.; denying 171 MOTION to Declare this Case Exceptional Pursu ant to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Join Additional Parties to Defendant's Request Under 35 U.S.C. § 285 by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.; denying 173 MOTION to Declare This Case Exceptional Under to 35 U.S.C. § 285 and to Join Additional Parties by Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/21/2015. (bgra)
June 6, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 88 Motion to Sever and for Expedited Trial Schedule. Defendant General Mills" Motion to Sever and for an Expedited TrialSchedule is DENIED. General Mills will be excluded from all deadlines provided in the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order that occur prior to the deadline for Dispositive Motions.Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 6/5/2014. (bgra)
November 19, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying motion to transfer. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/19/13. (tbro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DietGoal Innovations LLC v. Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Represented By: Steven War
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Represented By: Richard Drake Rochford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?