Virginian-Pilot Media Companies, LLC et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: |
Virginian-Pilot Media Companies, LLC and Scott Daugherty |
Defendant: |
Federal Bureau of Investigation |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00577 |
Filed: |
November 7, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia |
Office: |
Norfolk Office |
County: |
Norfolk City |
Presiding Judge: |
Tommy E. Miller |
Presiding Judge: |
Raymond A. Jackson |
Nature of Suit: |
Freedom of Information Act |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. ยง 552 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. The request to approve $127,857.50 in attorneys' fees is DENIED. After review of the petition, the Court finds it appropriate to reduce the fee request. The Court hereby APPROVES $100,000.00 in attorneys' fees and costs. Defendant is ORDERED to pay Plaintiff $100,000.00. Copy of Order provided to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/10/2016. (bgra)
|
November 25, 2015 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment That Defendant has Violated the Freedom of Information Act and that Plaintiff s are the Prevailing Parties in this Suit ; denying 44 Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery, to Expedite Responses to the Discovery that has been Filed, and to Allow the Deposition of the Individual Who Made the Decisions Involved in this Lawsuit. D efendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. The Court finds Defendant violated FOIA's statutory time to respond and failed to initially conduct a reasonable search in response to Plaintiffs' FOIA reque st. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court finds that Plaintiffs are the prevailing party, but Defendant properly withheld exempt material and an in camera inspection is declined. Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay on Discovery is DENIED. Plaintiffs shall file documentation to support their request for attorney's fees within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS) of this Order. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/25/2015. (bgra)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?