Wards Corner Beauty Academy v. National Accrediting Commission of Career Arts & Sciences
Plaintiff: Wards Corner Beauty Academy
Defendant: National Accrediting Commission of Career Arts & Sciences
Case Number: 2:2016cv00639
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Norfolk City
Presiding Judge: Mark S. Davis
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1099
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION AND ORDER - Having carefully examined the remoteness of Mr. Bouman's interest and the extent/degree of such interest, judgment is to be entered infavor of Defendant. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 2/12/18. (afar)
November 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 OPINION AND ORDER re: Denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting in part and Denying in part 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will conduct a bench trial/evidentiary hearing to begin on November 28, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis and filed on 11/24/17. Copies distributed to all counsel of record 11/24/17. (ldab, )
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM ORDER entered and filed 10/20/17: This matter is before the Court on cross-motions for summary judgment associated with Defendant's withdrawal of Plaintiff's accreditation as a barbering and cosmetology academy. ECF Nos. [6 3], 70 . Defendant's summary judgment motionseeks resolution of the entire case in its favor, whereasPlaintiff's motion seeks partial summary judgment consisting ofa Court order reinstating Plaintiff's accreditation, followed by a j ury trial to determine money damages. Id., as outlined. Plaintiff is therefore INSTRUCTED to file a status update/supplemental brief clarifying its trial demand no later than October 26, 2017, as outlined, and should not exceed fifteen pages in length. Defendant is INSTRUCTED to file a responsive brief no later than November 1, 2017, as outlined, and it is similarly limited to fifteen pages. To the extent that the parties believe that further settlement discussions may be fruitf ul prior to, or after, the submission of such supplemental briefs, the parties should contact the calendar clerk for the Magistrate Judge who conducted the original settlement conference in this case. (See Order and Foot Notes for Specifics) (Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 10/20/17). Copies provided as directed 10/20/17. (ecav, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wards Corner Beauty Academy v. National Accrediting Commission of Career Arts & Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wards Corner Beauty Academy
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Chema, II
Represented By: Steven Martin Gombos
Represented By: William A. Lascara
Represented By: Jacob Carlton Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Accrediting Commission of Career Arts & Sciences
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Brust
Represented By: Stephen Daniel Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?