Centripetal Networks, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Centripetal Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00094
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Fairfax
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
2 Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER granting #637 Motion for Pro hac vice for Elizabeth Rose Moulton as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 3/17/21. (tlev, )
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Cisco's #625 Motion for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2), #627 Motion for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) are each DENIED. The Court enters FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Centripetal, against Cisco, for the reasons and upon the terms set forth in its 10/5/20 Order as well as in this Order. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 3/17/21. (bpet, )
March 15, 2021 Filing 637 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Rose Moulton and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney J. Carr, IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7673621. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 25, 2020 Filing 636 REPLY to Response to Motion re #627 MOTION for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) and to Convert the Judgment to a Partial Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 25, 2020 Filing 635 REPLY to Response to Motion re #625 MOTION for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER granting #631 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Cisco shall file it's replies in support of its #625 Motion for New Trial and #627 Motion for Additional and Amended Findings by 11/25/2020. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 11/18/20. (bpet, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting #632 Motion to Dismiss Certain Stayed Claims without Prejudice. Centripetal's claims relating to the stayed IPR Patents (claims relating to the '213, '552, '713, '148, '077, '722 Patents asserted in the Amended Complaint, and certain claims of the '205 Patent that were subject to IPR institutions) are hereby dismissed. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 11/18/20. (bpet, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 632 Joint MOTION (Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Stayed Claims Without Prejudice) and Memorandum in Support by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 631 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #627 MOTION for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) and to Convert the Judgment to a Partial Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) , #625 MOTION for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
November 16, 2020 Filing 630 Memorandum in Opposition re #627 MOTION for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) and to Convert the Judgment to a Partial Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 16, 2020 Filing 629 Memorandum in Opposition re #625 MOTION for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 2, 2020 Filing 628 Memorandum in Support re #627 MOTION for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) and to Convert the Judgment to a Partial Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 2, 2020 Filing 627 MOTION for Additional and Amended Findings and Amended Judgment Under Rule 52(b) and to Convert the Judgment to a Partial Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 2, 2020 Filing 626 Memorandum in Support re #625 MOTION for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carr, Dabney)
November 2, 2020 Filing 625 MOTION for New Trial Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(a)(2) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Consent ORDER Approving Stipulation Regarding Stay and Appeal Bonds. Execution of the judgment is STAYED and the filing of any bond is WAIVED. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/28/20. (bpet, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 623 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Stay and Appeal Bonds by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
October 5, 2020 Filing 622 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/20. (bpet, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 621 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court FINDS the 856 Patent, the 176 Patent, the 193 Patent, and the 806 Patent claims valid and literally INFRINGED and the 205 Patent NOT INFRINGED. The Court FINDS the actual damages suffered by Centripetal as a result of infringement total $755,808,545; that the infringement was willful and egregious and shall be enhanced by a factor of 2.5x to equal $1,889,521,362.50. The Court awards pre-judgment interest of $13,717,925 applied to the actual damages before enhancement plus its costs. This, accordingly, equals a total award of $1,903,239,287.50 payable in a lump sum due on the judgment date. The Court, additionally, imposes a running royalty of 10% on the apportioned sales of the accused products and their successors for a period of three years, followed by a second three-year term with a running royalty of 5% on said sales upon the terms described supra. It DENIES any further relief to Centripetal at the termination of the second three-year term. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/5/20. (bpet, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting #578 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Linjun Xu terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/5/20. (bpet, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 619 OPINION AND ORDER denying #551 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/2/20. (bpet, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting #565 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/23/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting #421 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting #369 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting #362 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #352 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #347 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #321 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting #310 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER granting #303 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting #284 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #250 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting #231 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting #179 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER granting #164 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting #95 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting #490 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting #574 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting #571 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting #559 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER granting #553 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER granting #484 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER granting #481 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting #446 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #415 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #398 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting #383 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting #373 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting #357 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER granting #272 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #238 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting #214 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/20. (bpet, )
September 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard: #95 , #112 , #129 , #145 , #164 , #170 , #179 , #209 , #214 , #231 , #238 , #244 , #250 , #257 , #272 , #284 , #303 , #310 , #321 , #334 , #342 , #347 , #352 , #357 , #362 , #369 , #373 , #383 , #398 , #415 , #421 , #446 , #481 , #484 , #490 , #553 , #559 , #565 , #571 , #574 MOTIONS to Seal. (bpet, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 578 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion to Allow Withdrawal of Linjun Xu as Counsel of Record by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 577 Motion Hearing via ZoomGov before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 9/9/2020 re #551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Filed Under Seal) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Micah Block, Heath Brooks, Kimberly Force, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Comments of Court. Email sent to local counsel during hearing re trust agreements and sale of stocks. Arguments of counsel. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will DECLINE Cisco's motion to recuse itself and will prepare an opinion explaining the reasons for doing so. Further, an opinion on the merits of the case is forthcoming. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 576 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #574 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Trial Transcript and Exhibits (Noona, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 575 Memorandum in Support re #574 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Trial Transcript and Exhibits filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 574 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Trial Transcript and Exhibits by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 573 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #571 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcripts (Carr, Dabney)
September 4, 2020 Filing 572 Memorandum in Support re #571 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcripts filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
September 4, 2020 Filing 571 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Trial Transcripts by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 570 RESPONSE to Motion re #559 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 569 Sealed Document re #565 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 568 REPLY to Response to Motion re #551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Filed Under Seal) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 567 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #565 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 566 Memorandum in Support re #565 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
September 3, 2020 Filing 565 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
August 31, 2020 Filing 564 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #559 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #562 Memorandum in Opposition. (Noona, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 563 Declaration re #562 Memorandum in Opposition (of Paul Andre) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 562 Memorandum in Opposition re #551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Filed Under Seal) (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 561 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #559 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 560 Memorandum in Support re #559 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 559 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER re #551 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Plaintiff shall file a response brief within 7 days; Defendant may reply within 3 days thereafter. Hearing to be set for 9/9/20 at 2:30p by videoconference. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/24/20. (bpet, )
August 24, 2020 Motion Hearing as to #551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief set for 9/9/2020 at 02:30 PM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 557 Sealed Document re #553 MOTION to Seal Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 556 Sealed Document re #553 MOTION to Seal Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 555 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #553 MOTION to Seal Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 554 Memorandum in Support re #553 MOTION to Seal Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 553 MOTION to Seal Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 552 Memorandum in Support re #551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Filed Under Seal) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2020 Filing 551 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief (Filed Under Seal) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
August 10, 2020 Filing 550 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 23, held on 06-25-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 22, held on 6/11/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 548 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 21, held on 6/10/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 547 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 20B, Redacted held on 6/9/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 20A, held on 06-09-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 544 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 19B (Portions Redacted) held on 06-08-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 542 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 19A, Redacted, held on 6/8/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 540 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 18B, held on 6/4/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 539 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 18A (Portions Redacted), held on 06-04-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 537 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 17B, held on 6/3/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 536 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 17A, held on 06-03-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 535 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 16B, held on 6/2/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 534 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 16A (Portions Redacted), held on 06-02-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 532 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 15B, held on 06-01-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 15A, Redacted, held on 6/1/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 14B (Portions Redacted), held on 05-28-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 14A, held on 5/28/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 526 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 13B (Portions Redacted), held on 05-27-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 13A, held on 5/27/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 523 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 12B, held on 05-26-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 522 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 12A, held on 5/26/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 521 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 11 (Portions Redacted), held on 05-21-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 519 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 10, Redacted, held on 5/20/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 9B, held on 5/19/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 9A (Portions Redacted), held on 05-19-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 514 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 8B, held on 05-18-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 8A, held on 5/18/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 512 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 7B, held on 5/14/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 7A (Portions Redacted), held on 05-14-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 6B, Redacted, held on 5/13/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 507 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol. 6A (Portions Redacted), held on 05-13-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 5B, Redacted, held on 5/12/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 503 TRANSCRIPT of videoconference bench trial proceedings, Vol. 5A (Portions Redacted), held on 05-12-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 501 TRANSCRIPT of videoconference bench trial proceedings, Vol 3 held on 05-08-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 500 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 4, held on 5/11/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 499 TRANSCRIPT of videoconference bench trial proceedings, Vol 2B, held on 05-07-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 498 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 2A, held on 05/07/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
August 10, 2020 Filing 497 TRANSCRIPT of videoconference bench trial proceedings, Vol. 1B, held on 05-06-2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
August 10, 2020 Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference Bench Trial Proceedings, Vol 1A, held on 05/06/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
June 25, 2020 Filing 495 Evidentiary Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/25/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Hearing on damages. Court heard testimony from James Malackowski and Stephen Becker. Exhibits admitted. Arguments of counsel. The Court takes the matter under advisement at this time. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 494 RESPONSE to Motion re #484 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 19, 2020 Filing 493 Sealed Document re #490 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Second Declaration of Stephen L. Becker. (Carr, Dabney)
June 19, 2020 Filing 492 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #490 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Second Declaration of Stephen L. Becker (Carr, Dabney)
June 19, 2020 Filing 491 Memorandum in Support re #490 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Second Declaration of Stephen L. Becker filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 19, 2020 Filing 490 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Second Declaration of Stephen L. Becker by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
June 19, 2020 Filing 489 Declaration (Second) of Stephen L. Becker by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 488 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #479 NOTICE, #484 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Noona, Stephen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 487 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #484 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 486 Memorandum in Support re #484 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 485 Sealed Document re #481 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Declaration of Stephen L. Becker. (Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 484 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
June 18, 2020 Filing 483 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #481 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Declaration of Stephen L. Becker (Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 482 Memorandum in Support re #481 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Declaration of Stephen L. Becker filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 481 MOTION to Seal Schedules Attached to the Declaration of Stephen L. Becker by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 480 Declaration of Stephen L. Becker by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 18, 2020 Filing 479 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (PLAINTIFF CENTRIPETAL NETWORKS, INC.'S SUBMISSION REGARDING CISCO SYSTEM, INC.'S REVENUES PER REQUEST BY COURT) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Noona, Stephen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 478 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #475 Proposed Findings of Fact,, (Notice Of Filing Of [Corrected] Amended Pleading) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 477 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #475 Proposed Findings of Fact,, (Notice of Filing of Amended Exhibit 12) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12)(Noona, Stephen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 476 Bench Trial-Day 22- before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. completed on 6/11/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens, Michael H. Lee and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Closing arguments presented. The monthly sales data will be produced to Centripetal and to Dr. Becker on Friday, June 12, 2020. Both sides will submit their damages report, based on this data, by 4:00 p.m. on June 18, 2020. A hearing on damages is tentatively set for Thursday, June 25, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. via ZoomGov. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.) (Evidentiary Hearing re damages set for 6/25/2020 at 11:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 475 Proposed Findings of Fact by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Noona, Stephen) Modified on 6/12/2020 to remove Exhibit 12 at counsel's request. (clou ).
June 11, 2020 Filing 474 Proposed Findings of Fact by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 856-1, #2 Exhibit 856-2, #3 Exhibit 856-3, #4 Exhibit 856-4, #5 Exhibit 176-1, #6 Exhibit 176-2, #7 Exhibit 193-1, #8 Exhibit 193-2, #9 Exhibit 193-3, #10 Exhibit 193-4, #11 Exhibit 193-5, #12 Exhibit 806-1, #13 Exhibit 806-2, #14 Exhibit 205-1, #15 Exhibit 205-2)(Carr, Dabney)
June 10, 2020 Filing 473 Bench Trial-Day 21 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/10/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens, Michael H. Lee and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Plaintiff finished presentation of rebuttal case. Evidence concluded. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, June 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. for closing arguments. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Bench Trial set for 6/11/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 472 Bench Trial-Day 20 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/9/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens, Michael H. Lee and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Plaintiff resumed presentation of rebuttal case. Closing arguments to begin on Thursday, June 11, 2020. The defendant provided the Court with an update on the collection of revenue data of the accused products. Parties excused and directed to return on Wednesday, June 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.)(Bench Trial set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 471 Memorandum in Opposition re #469 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Judgment Of Validity Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(C)) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Carr, Dabney)
June 8, 2020 Filing 470 Memorandum in Support re #469 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Judgment Of Validity Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(C)) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
June 8, 2020 Filing 469 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Judgment Of Validity Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(C)) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
June 8, 2020 Filing 468 Bench Trial-Day 19 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/8/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens, Michael H. Lee and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits and then rested. Dr. Becker to provide the Court with the total monthly amount of sales of the infringed products of the '176, '193, '205, and '806 patent for a one-year period before June 1, 2017. Plaintiff's Rule 52 Motion for Judgment argued. Plaintiff to submit a 3-page brief on its points, defendant to reply within 24 hours of receipt. Plaintiff began presentation of rebuttal case. Parties excused and directed to return on Tuesday, June 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 6/9/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 467 Bench Trial-Day 18 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/4/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens, Michael H. Lee and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Monday, June 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 12:55-2:00 p.m.)(Bench Trial set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 466 Bench Trial-Day 17 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/3/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, John R. Gibson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, June 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.)(Bench Trial set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 465 Memorandum in Support re #464 MOTION for Inter Partes Review filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 464 MOTION for Inter Partes Review by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 463 Memorandum Bench Memorandum Responding to the Court's Questions Regarding the Inter Partes Review of the '193 Patent filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 2, 2020 Filing 462 Bench Trial-Day 16 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/2/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Christopher J. Tyson, Joseph A. Powers, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Bench trial. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. The parties are to submit a 2-page brief regarding the weight of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office's decision to deny reexamination of the interpartes review. Parties excused and directed to return on Wednesday, June 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 12:55-2:00 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 461 Bench Trial-Day 15 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/1/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Bench trial. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Tuesday, June 2, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 460 Bench Trial - Day 14 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/28/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet, John M. Baird and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Bench trial. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Monday, June 1, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:05-2:05 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 459 Memorandum in Opposition re #455 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of the Testimony of Mr. Douglas DiSabello From the Record filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DTX 1685, #2 DTX 1084)(Carr, Dabney)
May 28, 2020 Filing 458 Memorandum in Opposition re #453 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike DTX-1684 and Related Trial Testimony filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
May 27, 2020 Filing 457 Bench Trial-Day 13- before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/27/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Plaintiff to file a Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Schmidt. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, May 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(Lunch: 1:05-2:15 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)(lbax, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 456 Memorandum in Support re #455 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of the Testimony of Mr. Douglas DiSabello From the Record filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 455 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of the Testimony of Mr. Douglas DiSabello From the Record by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 454 Memorandum in Support re #453 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike DTX-1684 and Related Trial Testimony filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 453 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.s Motion to Strike DTX-1684 and Related Trial Testimony by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 452 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
May 26, 2020 Filing 451 Bench Trial-Day 12- before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/26/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah, Kris Kastens and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Defendant resumed presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Arguments heard re objection to portions of Di Sabello deposition. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Testimony argued. Parties may submit a brief no longer than 5 pages with attachment by 5:00 p.m., 5/27/20 and defendant may file an equivalent response by 4:00 p.m., 5/28/20. Parties excused and directed to return on Wednesday, May 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:08-2:15 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 450 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/21/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 11. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits and then rested its case in chief. Defense argued Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings pursuant to FRCP 52(c). For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED the motion. Defendant began presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Tuesday, May 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 12:35-1:35 p.m.)(Bench Trial set for 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 449 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #445 Memorandum in Support,. (Carr, Dabney)
May 21, 2020 Filing 448 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #446 MOTION to Seal an Exhibit to Cisco's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) at the Close of Plaintiff's Case (Carr, Dabney)
May 21, 2020 Filing 447 Memorandum in Support re #446 MOTION to Seal an Exhibit to Cisco's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) at the Close of Plaintiff's Case filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
May 21, 2020 Filing 446 MOTION to Seal an Exhibit to Cisco's Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) at the Close of Plaintiff's Case by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
May 21, 2020 Filing 445 Memorandum in Support re #444 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) at the Close of Plaintiff's Case filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K (Redacted Version), #12 Exhibit L)(Carr, Dabney)
May 21, 2020 Filing 444 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 52(c) at the Close of Plaintiff's Case by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
May 20, 2020 Filing 443 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/20/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 10. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Arguments heard on #270 Motion to Exclude the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and on #229 Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson. For the reasons stated on the record, the motions were DENIED. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, May 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:05-2:05 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 19, 2020 Filing 442 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/19/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 9. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Arguments heard on #270 Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson. The Court DENIED the motion as to the apportionment-related opinions of Dr. Striegel. #208 Motion in Limine #1 regarding prior litigation with Keysight/IXIA argued and SUSTAINED for the reasons stated on the record. Parties excused and directed to return on Wednesday, May 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:05-2:05 p.m.) Bench Trial set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr..
May 18, 2020 Filing 441 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/18/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 8. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Tuesday, May 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:10-2:10 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 440 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 439 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/14/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 7. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Court heard argument on #236 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products, and Patents. Parties excused and directed to return on Monday, May 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:15-2:15 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/18/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 13, 2020 Filing 438 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/13/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 6. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, May 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 1:05-2:05 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 12, 2020 Filing 437 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/12/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 5. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties directed to present the Court with a schedule of remaining witnesses and an estimate of time by tomorrow (5/13/20) morning. Parties excused and directed to return on Wednesday, May 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR and Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 12:55-1:55 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.) (Main Document 437 replaced on 5/13/2020) (lbax, ).
May 12, 2020 Filing 436 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents, #242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
May 11, 2020 Filing 435 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/11/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 4. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Tuesday, May 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 12:55-1:55 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Newport News Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 434 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/8/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 3. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Monday, May 11, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )(Lunch: 12:55-1:55 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 7, 2020 Filing 433 Bench Trial - Day 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/7/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Opening statements heard. Plaintiff began presentation of evidence through testimony and exhibits. Parties excused and directed to return on Friday, May 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Lunch: 1:00-2:00 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 432 RESPONSE to Motion re #415 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
May 6, 2020 Filing 431 RESPONSE in Support re #421 MOTION to Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
May 6, 2020 Filing 430 Bench Trial before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 5/6/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Day 1. The parties were directed to submit the factual points for each witness to be included in the witness binders: no more than 4 pages for the proponents, and no more than 2 pages for the cross examination. Centripetal presented tutorial on patent technology. Cisco presented tutorial on patent technology. Parties excused and directed to return on Thursday, May 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR and Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )( Lunch: 1:05-2:05 p.m.) (Bench Trial set for 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 429 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Combined Glossary of Acronyms) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
May 2, 2020 Filing 428 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Additional USPTO Decisions Concerning the Asserted Claims of the Patents-In-Suit (Carr, Dabney)
April 30, 2020 Filing 427 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #425 Joint MOTION to Close Courtroom to Prohibit Public Access to Portions of the Audio-Stream or Video of theTrial Proceedings Herein and to Seal Portions of the Trial Record (Noona, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 426 Memorandum in Support re #425 Joint MOTION to Close Courtroom to Prohibit Public Access to Portions of the Audio-Stream or Video of theTrial Proceedings Herein and to Seal Portions of the Trial Record filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 425 Joint MOTION to Close Courtroom to Prohibit Public Access to Portions of the Audio-Stream or Video of theTrial Proceedings Herein and to Seal Portions of the Trial Record by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 424 Sealed Document re #420 Proposed Findings of Fact. (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 423 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #421 MOTION to Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 422 Memorandum in Support re #421 MOTION to Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 421 MOTION to Seal Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 420 Proposed Findings of Fact by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 419 Sealed Document re #418 Proposed Findings of Fact, #415 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 418 Proposed Findings of Fact by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 417 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #415 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 416 Memorandum in Support re #415 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 415 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 414 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Acronyms and Abbreviations To Be Used At Trial (Carr, Dabney)
April 29, 2020 Filing 413 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #411 Pretrial Order Cisco's Revisions to Trial Witness List and Supplement to Factual Contentions and Triable Issues (Carr, Dabney)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER denying #255 , #287 Motions for Summary Judgment regarding the issue of infringement; reserving ruling on summary judgment regarding the application of prosecution history estoppel. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 4/24/20. (bpet, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 4/24/20 and filed 4/27/20. (lbax, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
April 24, 2020 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 4/23/2020, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 4/23/20 and filed in open court.(lbax, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 407 Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 4/23/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Lisa Kobialka, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Heath Brooks, Jennifer H. Forte, Mark C. Fleming, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Final pretrial conference held via Zoom. For the reasons stated on the record, the motions for summary judgment are DENIED. The issue of estoppel has not yet been resolved. Final Pretrial Order reviewed, signed, and filed in open court. Stipulation re witnesses appearing remotely to be submitted and added to the Order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER denying #387 Motion Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 4/23/20. (bpet, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 404 RESPONSE to Motion re #373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 17, 2020 Filing 403 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #398 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #402 Declaration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10)(Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 402 Declaration re #401 Memorandum in Opposition (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 (Public Version), #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 401 Memorandum in Opposition re #387 MOTION Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 400 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #398 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 399 Memorandum in Support re #398 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 398 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2020 Filing 405 Pretrial Conference before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 4/16/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Hannah Y. Lee, James R. Hannah and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Dabney J. Carr, IV, Matthew C. Gaudet and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. Pretrial conference held via Zoom. The Final Pretrial Conference set for April 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. will be conducted by Zoom. Zoom features previewed and trial schedule discussed. Witness binders to be dropped off to the U.S. Courthouse daily for the Court's use. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 397 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2020 Filing 396 RESPONSE to Motion re #369 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc's Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 4 and 6 and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 395 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #297 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 14, 2020 Filing 394 RESPONSE to Motion re #362 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting in part #389 Motion for Expedited Briefing. Centripetal is ORDERED to file a response to Cisco's #387 Motion Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference by noon on 4/17/20. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 4/13/20. (bpet, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 392 RESPONSE to Motion re #352 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 13, 2020 Filing 391 RESPONSE to Motion re #347 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Copying filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 390 Memorandum in Support re #389 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Consideration re #387 MOTION Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 389 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Consideration re #387 MOTION Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 388 Memorandum in Support re #387 MOTION Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference and Objections to Issues Raised at April 8, 2020 Telephonic Conference filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 387 MOTION Opposing Trial Entirely by Videoconference by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 386 Sealed Document re #382 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 10)(Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 385 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #383 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 384 Memorandum in Support re #383 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 383 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 382 REPLY to Response to Motion re #270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 10, 2020 Filing 381 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Notice Regarding Status of Inter Partes Review Proceedings Pursuant to the Court's Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) (Noona, Stephen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 380 RESPONSE to Motion re #334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 379 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #377 Declaration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12)(Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 378 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #376 Opposition. (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 377 Declaration re #376 Opposition (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 7(Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11(Public Version), #12 Exhibit 12 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 376 Opposition to #208 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-7 (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Oppositions To Cisco's Motions In Limine Nos. 1, 3, and 7)(Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 375 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 374 Memorandum in Support re #373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 373 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 372 Memorandum in Support re #369 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc's Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 4 and 6 and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 371 Sealed Document re #368 Memorandum in Opposition,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 28)(Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 370 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #369 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc's Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 4 and 6 and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 369 MOTION to Seal Response to Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc's Motions in Limine Nos. 1, 4 and 6 and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 368 Memorandum in Opposition re #213 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-6 (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 9, 2020 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4-8-2020, before Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2020.(stewart, jody)
April 8, 2020 Filing 367 Telephone Conference before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 4/8/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Hannah Y. Lee, and Paul Andre for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Dabney J. Carr, IV, and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. The Court directed that the bench trial commencing on Wednesday, May 6, 2020 will be conducted by Zoom, a video teleconference system. Also, the Final Pretrial Conference set for April 23, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. will also be conducted by Zoom. The parties should plan and agree on presenting a tutorial of the patent technology to the Court at the start of the trial. Defendant objected to the use of a video teleconference system for the trial and the Court directed that the parties file a brief stating their reasons for the objection. The outstanding motions in limine will be reserved for trial. Counsel and the Courtroom Deputy are directed to set up a hearing to test the features of Zoom. (Court Reporter Jody Stewart, OCR.)(lbax, )
April 8, 2020 Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 365 Sealed Document re #361 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 364 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #362 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 363 Memorandum in Support re #362 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 362 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 361 REPLY to Response to Motion re #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 360 Memorandum in Support re #357 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Centripetal's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 287] and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 359 Sealed Document re #356 Memorandum in Opposition,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit A to Jeffay Declaration, #6 Exhibit A to Reddy Declaration, #7 Declaration of Hari Shankar)(Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 358 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #357 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Centripetal's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 287] and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 357 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Centripetal's Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. 287] and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 7, 2020 Filing 356 Memorandum in Opposition re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Declaration of Kevin Jeffay, #9 Exhibit A to Jeffay Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit B to Jeffay Declaration, #11 Exhibit C to Jeffay Declaration, #12 Declaration of Dr. A.L. Narasimha Reddy, #13 Exhibit A to Reddy Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #14 Declaration of Hari Shankar (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 355 Sealed Document re #351 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 354 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #352 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 353 Memorandum in Support re #352 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 352 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 351 REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 350 Sealed Document re #346 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 349 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #347 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Copying (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 348 Memorandum in Support re #347 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Copying filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 347 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Copying by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 346 REPLY to Response to Motion re #236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 345 Sealed Document re #341 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 344 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #342 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 343 Memorandum in Support re #342 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 342 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
April 6, 2020 Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re #242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
April 2, 2020 Filing 340 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #338 Declaration,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15)(Noona, Stephen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 339 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson, #334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Noona, Stephen) Modified on 4/3/20 (bpet, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 338 Declaration re #337 Memorandum in Opposition, (of Lisa Kobialka) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14 (Public Version), #15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 337 Memorandum in Opposition re #270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 336 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 335 Memorandum in Support re #334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 334 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 31, 2020 Filing 332 RESPONSE to Motion re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 31, 2020 Filing 331 RESPONSE to Motion re #321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 30, 2020 Filing 330 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #297 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
March 30, 2020 Filing 329 RESPONSE to Motion re #303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Youngmin Park as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 3/11/20. (tlev, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Conference Proceedings held on 3/12/20, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul McManus, Telephone number 757-222-7077. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2020.(mcmanus, paul)
March 25, 2020 Filing 327 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #325 Declaration,,,, #321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 21, #18 Exhibit 22, #19 Exhibit 23, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 30)(Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 326 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #324 Memorandum in Opposition. (Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 325 Declaration re #324 Memorandum in Opposition (of Lisa Kobialka) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), #11 Exhibit 11 (Public Version), #12 Exhibit 12 (Public Version), #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14 (Public Version), #15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version), #16 Exhibit 16 (Public Version), #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 (Public Version), #19 Exhibit 19 (Public Version), #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21 (Public Version), #22 Exhibit 22 (Public Version), #23 Exhibit 23 (Public Version), #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 (Public Version), #27 Exhibit 27 (Public Version), #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30 (Public Version), #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 324 Memorandum in Opposition re #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 323 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 322 Memorandum in Support re #321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 321 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 320 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #316 Declaration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 10)(Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 319 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #315 Memorandum in Opposition,. (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 318 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #314 Declaration, #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11)(Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 317 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #313 Opposition. (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 316 Declaration re #315 Memorandum in Opposition, (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 315 Memorandum in Opposition re #236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 314 Declaration re #313 Opposition (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), #11 Exhibit 11 (Public Version), #12 Exhibit 12)(Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 313 Opposition to #242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 312 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 311 Memorandum in Support re #310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 24, 2020 Filing 310 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 309 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #307 Declaration,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24)(Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 308 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #306 Memorandum in Opposition. (Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 307 Declaration re #306 Memorandum in Opposition (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), #9 Exhibit 9 (Public Version), #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), #11 Exhibit 11 (Public Version), #12 Exhibit 12 (Public Version), #13 Exhibit 13 (Public Version), #14 Exhibit 14 (Public Version), #15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version), #16 Exhibit 16 (Public Version), #17 Exhibit 17 (Public Version), #18 Exhibit 18 (Public Version), #19 Exhibit 19 (Public Version), #20 Exhibit 20 (Public Version), #21 Exhibit 21 (Public Version), #22 Exhibit 22 (Public Version), #23 Exhibit 23 (Public Version), #24 Exhibit 24 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 306 Memorandum in Opposition re #229 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 305 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 304 Memorandum in Support re #303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 303 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 302 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Additional Patent Trial and Appeal Board Final Written Decisions Concerning Certain Asserted Patents (Carr, Dabney)
March 19, 2020 Filing 301 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Submission of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
March 19, 2020 Filing 300 Joint NOTICE by Parties of Withdrawal of Certain Pretrial Motions and Motions in Limine and Memorandum in Support by Centripetal Networks, Inc., re #248 MOTION to Bifurcate the Issues of Liability and Damages, #213 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-6, #208 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-7 (Noona, Stephen) Modified text on 3/31/20 (bpet, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 299 RESPONSE in Support re #284 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 17, 2020 Filing 298 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #296 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 3/16/20. (bpet, )
March 14, 2020 Filing 296 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #294 Telephone Conference,,, Set Hearings,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, #74 Scheduling Order, (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noona, Stephen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 295 RESPONSE to Motion re #272 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 12, 2020 Filing 294 Telephone Conference before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 3/12/2020. Appearances: Stephen E. Noona, Hannah Y. Lee, and Lisa Kobialka for the Plaintiff. Louis N. Jameson, Dabney J. Carr, IV, and Neil H. MacBride for the Defendant. The parties agreed to waive the jury in this case. The Court reset the Bench Trial for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 and reset the Final Pretrial Conference for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2. (Court Reporter Paul McManus, OCR.)(lbax, )
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #283 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 3/11/20. (bpet, )
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #282 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 3/11/20. (bpet, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 291 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #289 Declaration,,, #284 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 290 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 289 Declaration re #288 Memorandum in Support (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), #9 Exhibit 9 (Public Version), #10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), #11 Exhibit 11 (Public Version), #12 Exhibit 12 (Public Version), #13 Exhibit 13 (Public Version), #14 Exhibit 14 (Public Version), #15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version), #16 Exhibit 16 (Public Version), #17 Exhibit 17 (Public Version), #18 Exhibit 18 (Public Version), #19 Exhibit 19 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 288 Memorandum in Support re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 286 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #284 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 285 Memorandum in Support re #284 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 284 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 11, 2020 Filing 283 Joint MOTION to Amend #74 Scheduling Order (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 282 Joint MOTION to Amend #74 Scheduling Order (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 281 RESPONSE to Motion re #250 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate and Certain Exhibits Thereto and Memorandum in Support filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 280 RESPONSE to Motion re #244 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 10, 2020 Filing 279 RESPONSE to Motion re #238 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 9, 2020 Filing 278 RESPONSE in Support re #231 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noona, Stephen)
March 9, 2020 Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #253 Motion for Pro hac vice for Micah Galvin Block as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 3/5/20. (tlev, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 275 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6)(Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 274 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #272 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 273 Memorandum in Support re #272 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 272 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 271 Memorandum in Support re #270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 270 MOTION to Exclude the Apportionment-Related Opinions of Dr. Aaron Striegel and the Related Royalty Base Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 6, 2020 Filing 269 RESPONSE to Motion re #209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #235 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jeffrey Eng as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/5/20. (tlev, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #223 Motion for Pro hac vice for Julian Pymento as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/05/20. (tlev, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #224 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jonathan Caplan as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/05/20. (tlev, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 265 RESPONSE to Motion re #214 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1-4, 7-9, 11, 13-17 thereto filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #204 Motion for Pro hac vice for Christopher Joseph Letkewicz as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/4/20. (tlev, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Pro hac vice for Mark Christopher Fleming as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/04/2020. (tlev, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joel Erik Connolly as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/4/20. (tlev, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Pro hac vice for Aaron Mark Frankel as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 03/4/20. (tlev, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 260 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Hughes, #2 Declaration of Peter G. Jones, #3 Declaration of Hari Shankar, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 19)(Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 259 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #257 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 258 Memorandum in Support re #257 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 257 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Certain Exhibits and Declarations Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 256 Memorandum in Support re #255 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Hughes (Filed Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Peter G. Jones (Filed Under Seal), #3 Declaration of Hari Shankar (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33)(Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 255 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 4, 2020 Filing 254 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Y. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
March 4, 2020 Filing 253 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Micah G. Block and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
March 4, 2020 Notice of Correction re #227 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Y. Park and #226 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Micah G. Block and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride. The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include the written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 252 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #250 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate and Certain Exhibits Thereto and Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 251 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #250 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate and Certain Exhibits Thereto and Memorandum in Support (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 250 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Bifurcate and Certain Exhibits Thereto and Memorandum in Support by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 249 Memorandum in Support re #248 MOTION to Bifurcate the Issues of Liability and Damages (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3)(Carr, Dabney) (Main Document 249 replaced on 3/4/2020) (bpet, ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 248 MOTION to Bifurcate the Issues of Liability and Damages by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Carr, Dabney) **Motion withdrawn by #300 Notice (bpet, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 247 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carr, Dabney) Modified text on 3/4/20 (bpet, ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 246 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #244 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 245 Memorandum in Support re #244 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 244 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 243 Memorandum in Support re #242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 242 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Drs. Michael T. Goodrich and Ricardo Valerdi by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 241 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carr, Dabney) Modified text on 3/4/20 (bpet, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 240 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #238 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 239 Memorandum in Support re #238 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 238 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 237 Memorandum in Support re #236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Centripetal's Experts Regarding Alleged Prior Knowledge and Alleged Copying of Centripetal's Technology, Products and Patents by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 3, 2020 Filing 235 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Eng and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7102213. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 234 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #229 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carr, Dabney) Modified text on 3/3/20 (bpet, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 233 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #231 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 232 Memorandum in Support re #231 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 231 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson and Certain Exhibits Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 230 Memorandum in Support re #229 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson (Public Version) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 229 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Lance Gunderson by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #191 Transcript,,, (Joint Notice of Unsuccessful Mediation) (Noona, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 227 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Y. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7099649. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
March 2, 2020 Filing 226 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Micah G. Block and Certification of Local Counsel Neil H. MacBride Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7099629. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (MacBride, Neil)
March 2, 2020 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Harvey MacBride on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (MacBride, Neil)
March 2, 2020 Filing 224 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Caplan and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7099482. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 2, 2020 Filing 223 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian Pymento and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7099446. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 28, 2020 Filing 222 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #219 Declaration,,, (of Filing of Additional Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 221 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #219 Declaration,,, #209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 220 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #219 Declaration,,, #209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 21)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 219 Declaration re #215 Memorandum in Support (of Lisa Kobialka) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), #6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17(Public Version), #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19 (Public Version), #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21(Public Version), #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23 (Public Version), #23 Exhibit 24 (Public Version), #24 Exhibit 25 (Public Version), #25 Exhibit 26 (Public Version), #26 Exhibit 27 (Public Version), #27 Exhibit 28 (Public Version), #28 Exhibit 29)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 218 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #214 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1-4, 7-9, 11, 13-17 thereto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 17)(Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 217 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #214 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1-4, 7-9, 11, 13-17 thereto (Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 216 Memorandum in Support re #214 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1-4, 7-9, 11, 13-17 thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 215 Memorandum in Support re #213 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-6 filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 214 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1-4, 7-9, 11, 13-17 thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 213 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-6 by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 212 Memorandum in Support re #208 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-7 filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Errata 13 (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal))(Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 211 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 210 Memorandum in Support re #209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 209 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2020 Filing 208 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-7 by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 207 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Mark Frankel and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7095940. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 21, 2020 Filing 204 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Joseph Letkewicz and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney J. Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7086873. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 21, 2020 Filing 203 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Erik Connolly and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney J. Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7086869. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #196 Motion for Pro hac vice for Eileen Patt as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 02/20/2020. (tlev, )
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #200 Motion for Pro hac vice for Heath Brooks as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 02/20/2020. (tlev, )
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 OPINION & ORDER memorializing and explaining the Court's claim construction rulings. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 2/20/20. (bpet, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 201 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Fleming and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney Jefferson Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7082424. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 19, 2020 Filing 200 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heath A. Brooks and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney Jefferson Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7081916. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 18, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
February 17, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #191 Transcript,,, (Joint Status Report Regarding Claim Construction Requested By Court) (Noona, Stephen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 196 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eileen Patt and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7076903. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 195 RESPONSE to Motion re #179 MOTION to Seal filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 2/12/20. (bpet, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 193 Claim Construction Brief Cisco's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
February 11, 2020 Filing 192 Claim Construction Brief (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief on Claim Construction) to #191 Transcript,,, filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 7, 2020 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Markman hearing) held on 2-6-2020, before Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2020.(stewart, jody)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement conference scheduled for 3/20/20 at 11:00 a.m.; memorandum due by noon on 3/16/20; see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 2/7/20. (bpet, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 189 Markman Hearing and motion hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 2/6/2020. Appearances: Paul J. Andre, James R. Hannah, and Stephen E. Noona for the Plaintiff. Kevin P. Anderson, Christopher J. Tyson, Louis N. Jameson and Dabney J. Carr, IV for the Defendant. Claim terms defined. The Court takes under advisement the terms "responsive to correlating" and "generate, based on the correlating, one or more rules." The parties are to submit a brief of no more than 3 pages for each term by COB Tuesday, 2/11/20. Argument heard on [148) Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances filed by the Plaintiff. Defense alleges this was not an accused product in this case until December of 2019. The Court GRANTS the motion and orders the defendant to produce the financial data. The parties are directed to attend a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Leonard on Friday, 3/20/20 at 11:00 a.m. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Jody Stewart, OCR.)(lbax, )
February 6, 2020 Motion Hearing as to #148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances set for 2/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
February 6, 2020 Settlement Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 188 Withdrawal of Motion by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action (Carr, Dabney)
February 5, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #176 NOTICE (Jointly Proposed Order Of Presentation Of Disputed Claim Terms) (Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 185 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #183 Declaration, #179 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 184 Sealed REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances . (Noona, Stephen) Modified text on 2/6/20 (bpet, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 183 Declaration re #182 Reply to Response to Motion (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), #3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), #4 Exhibit 4)(Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 181 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #179 MOTION to Seal (Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 180 Memorandum in Support re #179 MOTION to Seal filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 5, 2020 Filing 179 MOTION to Seal by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice Regarding Status Of Inter Partes Review Proceedings Pursuant To The Court's Order Regarding Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information (ESI)) (Noona, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #74 Scheduling Order, of Filing of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Noona, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Filing 175 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Ex. I to Response to Motion to Compel re #170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148). (Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 174 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Ex. H to Response to Motion to Compel re #170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148). (Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 173 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Ex. E to Response to Motion to Compel re #170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148). (Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 172 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148) (Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 171 Memorandum in Support re #170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E, H and I to Cisco's Response to Motion to Compel Revenues for Cisco's Firepower Applicances (Doc. 148) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2020 Filing 169 Memorandum in Opposition re #148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit I (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Carr, Dabney)
January 30, 2020 Filing 168 Reply Claim Construction Brief (Redacted) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibit R, #4 Exhibit S, #5 Exhibit T, #6 Exhibit U, #7 Exhibit V, #8 Exhibit W, #9 Exhibit X, #10 Exhibit Y, #11 Exhibit Z, #12 Exhibit AA (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit BB, #14 Exhibit CC, #15 Exhibit DD, #16 Exhibit EE, #17 Exhibit FF, #18 Exhibit GG)(Carr, Dabney) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/31/20 at filer's request) (bpet, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 167 Sealed Reply Claim Construction Brief and Ex. AA Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA)(Carr, Dabney)
January 30, 2020 Filing 166 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #164 MOTION to Seal Reply Claim Construction Brief and Ex. AA Thereto (Carr, Dabney)
January 30, 2020 Filing 165 Memorandum in Support re #164 MOTION to Seal Reply Claim Construction Brief and Ex. AA Thereto filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
January 30, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION to Seal Reply Claim Construction Brief and Ex. AA Thereto by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
January 30, 2020 Filing 163 Declaration re #161 Claim Construction Brief (of Dr. Nenad Medvidovic) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 162 Declaration re #161 Claim Construction Brief (of Hien Lien) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Noona, Stephen)
January 30, 2020 Filing 161 Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Noona, Stephen)
January 24, 2020 Filing 160 RESPONSE in Support re #145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
January 24, 2020 Filing 159 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #158 Claim Construction Brief Exhibits G-O (Attachments: #1 Ex. G, #2 Ex. H, #3 Ex. I, #4 Ex. J, #5 Ex. K, #6 Ex. L, #7 Ex. M, #8 Ex. N, #9 Ex. O)(Carr, Dabney)
January 24, 2020 Filing 158 Claim Construction Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F)(Carr, Dabney)
January 23, 2020 Filing 157 Declaration re #155 Claim Construction Brief of Dr. Nenad Medvidovic by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 156 Declaration re #155 Claim Construction Brief of Hien Lien by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Noona, Stephen)
January 23, 2020 Filing 155 Claim Construction Brief filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
January 21, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
January 17, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Notice of Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 152 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #150 Declaration, #145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 7)(Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 151 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents, #149 Memorandum in Support. (Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 150 Declaration re #149 Memorandum in Support (of Paul Andre) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 149 Memorandum in Support re #148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Compel Revenues for Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Firepower Appliances by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 147 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 146 Memorandum in Support re #145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Pro hac vice for Phuong Diem Nguyen as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/20/19. (bpet, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Pro hac vice for Gregory Carl Proctor as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/20/19. (bpet, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 142 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Phuong Diem Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6995044. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 19, 2019 Filing 141 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Carl Proctor and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6994062. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
December 18, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kevin Paul Anderson as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/17/2019. (bboy, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 12-12-2019, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020.(naughton, carol)
December 12, 2019 Filing 136 Motion Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 12/12/2019 re #115 Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the motion. No written order will issue. Court adjourned. Appearances: Paul J. Andre and Stephen E. Noona for the Plaintiff. Matthew C. Gaudet and Dabney J. Carr, IV for the Defendant. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 135 RESPONSE in Support re #112 MOTION to Seal filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Pro hac vice for Cristina Lynn Martinez as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/11/2019. (bboy, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 133 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #129 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel. (Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Filing 132 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #129 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel. (Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Filing 131 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #129 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel (Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Filing 130 Memorandum in Support re #129 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Filing 129 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Filing 128 Memorandum in Opposition re #115 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3)(Carr, Dabney)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/11/19. (bpet, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 126 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Paul Anderson and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney Jefferson Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6979624. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
December 10, 2019 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 11-26-2019, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020.(naughton, carol)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Expedite. Defendant shall file a response to the #115 Motion to Compel by 12/11/19; a hearing on the motion will be set for 12/12/19. Plaintiff will not be permitted to file a rebuttal brief. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/9/19. (bpet, )
December 10, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #115 Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses set for 12/12/2019 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 123 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cristina Martinez and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975573. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael Hao Lee as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/04/2019. (bboy, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 121 Memorandum in Support re #120 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 120 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 119 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #117 Declaration,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 15)(Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 118 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #116 Memorandum in Support. (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 117 Declaration re #115 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses Declaration of Hannah Lee in Support of Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), #9 Exhibit 9 (Public Version), #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 116 Memorandum in Support re #115 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses (Public Version) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION to Compel Certain Documents and Discovery Responses by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 114 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #112 MOTION to Seal (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 113 Memorandum in Support re #112 MOTION to Seal filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION to Seal by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Pro hac vice for Yuridia Caire as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/04/2019. (bboy, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 110 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Yuridia Caire and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6966723. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 109 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Hao Lee and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6966328. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 26, 2019 Filing 108 Motion Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 11/26/2019 re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Appearances: James R. Hannah and Stephen E. Noona for the Plaintiff. Matthew C. Gaudet and Dabney J. Carr, IV for the Defendant. Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. The Plaintiff shall list each product and the claim it infringes. Chart should be organized for each product. The information shall be provided within 14 days of today's date by 5:00 p.m. The court will draft a written opinion explaining the rationale for its reasoning. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Pro hac vice for Linjun Xu as to Centripetal Networks, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 11/25/2019. (bboy, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Pro hac vice for Shannon Hannah Hedvat as to Centripetal Networks, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 11/25/2019. (bboy, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Pro hac vice for Melissa Theresa Giorgi Brenner as to Centripetal Networks, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 11/25/2019. (bboy, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Pro hac vice for Hien Khanh Lien as to Centripetal Networks, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 11/25/2019. (bboy, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carr, Dabney)
November 20, 2019 Filing 100 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #99 Declaration, #95 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 99 Declaration re #98 Opposition (of Hannah Lee) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Public Version), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 98 Opposition to #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 97 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #95 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 96 Memorandum in Support re #95 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 94 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Linjun Xu and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6949949. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 93 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hien Khanh Lien and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6949946. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 92 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Theresa Giorgi Brenner and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6949943. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 91 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Hannah Hedvat and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6949930. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Corrected Report Pursuant to the Court's Order Regarding ESI (Carr, Dabney)
November 18, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #81 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (of Filing of ESI Report) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Report Pursuant to the Court's Order Regarding ESI (Carr, Dabney)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Expedited Briefing. Response to #82 Motion to Compel due by 11/20/19; reply due by 11/22/19 at noon. Hearing set for 11/26/19 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 11/12/19. (bpet, )
November 13, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) set for 11/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 86 Memorandum in Support re #85 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Consideration re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 11, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Consideration re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
November 11, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) Request for Oral Argument (Carr, Dabney)
November 11, 2019 Filing 83 Memorandum in Support re #82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Carr, Dabney)
November 11, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Compel a Complete Response to Cisco's Interrogatory No. 1 (Infringement Contentions) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 11/6/19. (bpet, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kristopher Kastens as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 10/23/2019. (bboy, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 79 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristopher Kastens and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6889434. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 78 Joint MOTION Entry of Order Regarding Concurrent Litigation and Electronically Stored Information by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2019 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Agreed ORDER granting #71 Consent Joint Motion for Discovery Limitations. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/10/19. (bpet, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re #70 NOTICE filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 10/10/19. (bpet, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 10/10/19. (lbax, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Carr, Dabney)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Pro hac vice for Nicole Elizabeth Johnson as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 10/03/2019. (tlev, )
October 3, 2019 Stay lifted effective 10/2/2019. (bpet, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 71 Consent Joint MOTION for Discovery Limitations (and Memorandum in Support) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #68 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Joint Notice of Submission of Pretrial Schedule Pursuant to Court Order) (Noona, Stephen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 69 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole Elizabeth Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6862410. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part #59 Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen the Case. The stay in this case is LIFTED AND THE CASE IS REOPENED IN PART EFFECTIVE 10/2/19. On or before 10/2/19, the parties are DIRECTED to confer and submit a proposed case scheduling order consistent with a 4/7/20 trial date. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 9/18/19. (bpet, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Motions Hearing) held on 09-11-2019, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2019.(naughton, carol)
September 16, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Baird on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Baird, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 65 Motion Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 9/11/2019 re #59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. Appearances: Paul J. Andre and Stephen E. Noona for the Plaintiff. Matthew C. Gaudet and Dabney J. Carr, IV for the Defendant. Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS the motion to lift the stay as to the patents not in the IPR and sets a jury trial date of March 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The stay will be effective 10/2/19 and a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference is tentatively set for 10/3/19. The parties are to submit their proposed pretrial deadlines on or before 10/2/19 based on the March 2020 trial date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, ) (Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel T. McCloskey terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 8/6/19. (bpet, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Daniel T. McCloskey (Unopposed) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
July 26, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay set for 9/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Noona, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 61 Memorandum in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
June 10, 2019 Filing 60 Memorandum in Support re #59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to Lift Stay and Reopen Case re #58 Order on Motion to Stay by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the IPR petitions. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 2/25/19. (bpet, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings Second Notice of Patent Trial and Appeal Board Institution Decisions Concerning Certain Asserted Patents (Carr, Dabney)
January 24, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings Notice of Patent Trial and Appeal Board Institution Decisions Concerning Certain Asserted Patents (Carr, Dabney)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Reassign Case. The Court ORDERS that this matter be REASSIGNED to Judge Morgan. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 11/27/2018. (dcou, )
November 27, 2018 Case Reassigned to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. District Judge Mark S. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (dcou, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Reassign Case (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer or Reassign Case To Judge Morgan) (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer or Reassign Case to Judge Morgan) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2018 Filing 53 Memorandum in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Reassign Case (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer or Reassign Case To Judge Morgan) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
November 6, 2018 Filing 52 Declaration re #51 Memorandum in Support (of Lisa Kobialka) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 51 Memorandum in Support re #50 MOTION to Reassign Case (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer or Reassign Case To Judge Morgan) filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Reassign Case (Plaintiff Centripetal Networks, Inc.'s Motion To Transfer or Reassign Case To Judge Morgan) by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Noona, Stephen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
October 3, 2018 Filing 47 Memorandum in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Hannah Lee in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Lee Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Lee Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Lee Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Lee Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Lee Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Lee Declaration)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
September 19, 2018 Filing 46 Memorandum in Support re #45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Carr, Dabney)
September 19, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review Proceedings by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
August 21, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action - Notice of Submission of Motion on Briefs (Carr, Dabney)
August 14, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Filing of Inter Partes Review Petitions Concerning Asserted Patents (Carr, Dabney)
May 3, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 27, 2018 Filing 41 Memorandum in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Hannah Lee in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Lee Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Lee Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Lee Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Lee Affidavit)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Pro hac vice for Matthew Christopher Gaudet as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 04/16/18. (tlev, )
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro hac vice for Hannah Yunkyung Lee as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 4/16/18. (tlev, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 13, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Plaintiff's Second, Fourth, Sixth, Eighth, Tenth, Twelfth, Fourteenth, Sixteenth, Eighteenth, Twentieth and Twenty-Second Causes of Action by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 13, 2018 Filing 36 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Carr, Dabney)
April 13, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Carr, Dabney)
April 11, 2018 Filing 34 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Christopher Gaudet and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6034186. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
April 11, 2018 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah Yunkyung Lee and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6032791. by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
March 29, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #29 Amended Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 33 through 49 to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39, #8 Exhibit 40, #9 Exhibit 41, #10 Exhibit 42, #11 Exhibit 43, #12 Exhibit 44, #13 Exhibit 45, #14 Exhibit 46, #15 Exhibit 47, #16 Exhibit 48, #17 Exhibit 49)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
March 29, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #29 Amended Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 23 through 32 to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 32)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
March 29, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #29 Amended Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 9 through 22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
March 29, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc., filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel T. McCloskey as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 3/19/18. (bpet)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joseph A. Powers as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 3/19/18. (bpet)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jennifer H. Forte as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 3/19/18. (bpet)
March 14, 2018 Filing 25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel T. McCloskey and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5991254. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
March 13, 2018 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. Powers and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5988732. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
March 13, 2018 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer H. Forte and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5988538. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
March 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Tyson on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Tyson, Christopher)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Louis Norwood Jameson as to Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 03/13/18. (tlev, )
March 9, 2018 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Louis Norwood Jameson and Certification of Local Counsel John R. Gibson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5984070. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Gibson, John)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due from Cisco Systems, Inc, by 4/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 3/2/18. (bpet)
March 1, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. on Cisco Systems, Inc; served on 2/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (bpet)
February 27, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, John)
February 27, 2018 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (bpet)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Lisa Kobialka as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 2/26/18. (tlev, )
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Russell Hannah as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 2/23/18. (tlev, )
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Paul Joseph Andre as to Centripetal Networks, Inc. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis on 02/23/18. (tlev, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Kobialka and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Filing 12 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James R. Hannah and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Filing 11 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Andre and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Notice of Correction re #8 Motions to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Andre, #9 Lisa Kobialka, #10 and James Hannah and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell: The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay additional filing fees. (tlev, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Hannah and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5955140. Application by by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Kobialka and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5955110. Application filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Andre and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin M. O'Donnell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5955074. Application made by Centripetal Networks, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 33 through 48 to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #33 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #34 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #35 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #36 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #37 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit #38 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit #39 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit #40 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit #41 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit #42 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit #43 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibit #44 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit #45 to Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit #46 to Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit #47 to Complaint, #16 Exhibit Exhibit #48 to Complaint)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 23 through 32 to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #23 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #24 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #25 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #26 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #27 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit #28 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit #29 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit #30 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit #31 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit #32 to Complaint)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Centripetal Networks, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Notice of Submission of Exhibits 9 through 22 to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #9 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit #10 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #11 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #12 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #13 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit #14 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit #15 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit #16 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit #17 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit #18 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit #19 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibit #20 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit #21 to Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit #22 to Complaint)(O'Donnell, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (epri)
February 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri)
February 13, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (epri)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5944337.), filed by Centripetal Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centripetal Networks, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Represented By: John Robert Gibson
Represented By: Jennifer H. Forte
Represented By: Louis Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Daniel T. McCloskey
Represented By: Joseph A. Powers
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Tyson
Represented By: James Youngmin Park
Represented By: Joel Erik Connolly
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Gaudet
Represented By: John Matthew Baird
Represented By: Nicole Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Represented By: Heath Brooks
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Moulton
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Represented By: Mark Christopher Fleming
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Letkewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centripetal Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffery Thomas Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Martin O'Donnell
Represented By: Paul Joseph Andre
Represented By: James Russell Hannah
Represented By: Lisa Kobialka
Represented By: Phuong Diem Nguyen
Represented By: Hannah Yunkyung Lee
Represented By: Yuridia Caire
Represented By: Jonathan Caplan
Represented By: Julian Pymento
Represented By: Eileen Patt
Represented By: Gregory Carl Proctor
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Hien Khanh Lien
Represented By: Aaron Mark Frankel
Represented By: Shannon Hannah Hedvat
Represented By: Melissa Theresa Giorgi Brenner
Represented By: Jeffrey Eng
Represented By: Cristina Lynn Martinez
Represented By: Kristopher Benjamin Kastens
Represented By: Michael Hao Lee
Represented By: Linjun Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?