BUNGE S.A. v. Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD.

Plaintiff: BUNGE S.A.
Defendant: Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00375
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Norfolk City
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 Marshal's Return of Service re Verified Complaint, Order for Warrant and Warrant on Master of ocean going bulk carrier vessel M/V SANKO FORTUNE, IMO Ship No. 9532202 executed as to Dominion Terminal Associates. (clou )
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/19/18. (copy hand delivered to USM)(afar)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BUNGE S.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, James)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Motions Notice)(afar)
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 Process Of Maritime Attachment And Garnishment (afar) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/18/2018) (afar, ).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Issue Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, Appointing Substitute Custodian and Scope of Service. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/16/18. (afar)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support of re #5 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian filed by BUNGE S.A. (afar)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by BUNGE S.A. (afar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #1 Declaration) (afar, ).
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support of re #3 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Specifically Appointing Persons to Serve Process filed by BUNGE S.A.. (afar)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for an Order Authorizing Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Specifically Appointing Persons to Serve Process by BUNGE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(afar) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/18/2018) (afar, ).
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BUNGE S.A.. (afar)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683039836) filed by BUNGE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Letter, #7 Receipt)(afar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUNGE S.A. v. Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gulf Shipping (Singapore) PTE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUNGE S.A.
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Ganley
Represented By: Steven Michael Stancliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?