Hong v. Mortgage Research Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Hong
Defendant: John Doe and Mortgage Research Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00622
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Hearing by Mortgage Research Center, LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) (Moran, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Hong. (Denton, Jeremiah)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Denton, Jeremiah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Moran, Thomas)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
November 27, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, )
November 26, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6378134.), filed by Mortgage Research Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moran, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Mortgage Research Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Research Center, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hong
Represented By: Jeremiah Andrew Denton, IV
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Denton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?