Dail v. Bank Of America, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Erin Howerton Dail
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A., and Equity Trustees, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00640
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Van Patten Dougherty terminated. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 01/18/2019. (tamarm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Dougherty, Ryan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William McFarland on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A., (McFarland, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant Bank of America. N.A. shall have until and including January 17, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 1/3/2019. (jrin)
January 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Miller. #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand (jrin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Ryan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Remand by Erin Howerton Dail. (Thompson, Heath)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Erin Howerton Dail. (Thompson, Heath)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Erin Howerton Dail. (Thompson, Heath)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Dougherty, Ryan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Dougherty, Ryan)
November 30, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Van Patten Dougherty on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bank Of America, N.A. (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6385319.), filed by Bank Of America, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure, #7 Notice of Appearance)(Dougherty, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dail v. Bank Of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Ryan Van Patten Dougherty
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Trustees, LLC.
Represented By: Robert Ryan Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Howerton Dail
Represented By: Heath J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?