BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Basnight
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Ted Basnight
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ted Basnight. (bpet, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Default as to Ted Basnight d/b/a Basnight Hauling by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of George E. Stewart in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Stewart, George)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel. (bpet, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.; Ted Basnight served on 2/1/19. (bpet, ) (Main Document 5 replaced with original received by Clerks Office on 2/27/19) (bpet, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ted Basnight. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Stewart, George)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6438039.), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Stewart, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Basnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Basnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: George Edward Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?