Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Pentz et al

Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Defendant: Natalee Pentz, The Estate of Mark Earl Dasey, Deceased, by and through Edward J. Tufts and Anna M. Tufts, Co-Executors of the Estate of Mark Earl Dasey, Anna M. Tufts and Edward J. Tufts
Case Number: 2:2019cv00015
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF Deposit Interpleader Funds. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/22/2019. (clou )
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(clou )
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Moore, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Moore, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Moore, Peter)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6438082.), filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - H, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Peter) (Attachment 2 replaced on with a non-fillable pdf version on 1/9/2019) (epri, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Pentz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Peter Meredith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalee Pentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Mark Earl Dasey, Deceased, by and through Edward J. Tufts and Anna M. Tufts, Co-Executors of the Estate of Mark Earl Dasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M. Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?