Endres et al v. Jackson Hewitt, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Latonya Fields, Tom Endres and Laura Metz
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc. and Tax Services of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 28 Motion Hearing before District Judge Robert G. Doumar held on 3/14/2019 re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc. Appearances: Conrad M. Shumadine, Jason S. Hartley, Joseph R. Saveri and Richard M. Paul, III for the Plaintiffs. Scott A. McIntosh and Jonathan P. Labukas for the Defendants. Motion hearing re 38 , #11 , #12 and #22 Motions to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division). Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court continues the STAY in these cases until the Court enters a decision concerning venue. No further motions can be filed in any of the four cases without leave of court. The Court will issue a written opinion explaining its ruling in more detail. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
March 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re #26 NOTICE: Attorney notified that leave of Court is needed to file this document. (bpet, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority (Doc. No. 26) (with Incorporated Memorandum) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority), #2 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
March 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz re #24 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Opinion) (Shumadine, Conrad) Modified text on 3/12/19 (bpet, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 25 Rebuttal Brief re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Victoria McShane)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 Opposition to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 22, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER. #16 Motion to Stay is GRANTED and this action is stayed pending resolution of #11 Motion to Transfer; #6 Motion to Consolidate and #8 Motion for Entry of Case Management Order are HELD IN ABEYANCE; #18 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule is DISMISSED as MOOT. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the courtroom deputy w/in 7 days to schedule a hearing on the #11 Motion to Transfer. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/20/19. (bpet, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVERS OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tom Endres, Laura Metz, Latonya Fields. Jackson Hewitt, Inc; Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc; and Tax Services of America, Inc. waivers sent on 2/19/19. (bpet, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 Rebuttal Brief re #8 MOTION for Entry of Order filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 Rebuttal Brief re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard: #18 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay (Docket No. 16). (bpet, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay (Docket No. 16) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order (Alternative Proposed Order) Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott McIntosh, #2 Exhibit A (Motion), #3 Exhibit B (Order))(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Order filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria McShane)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tax Services of America, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Class Action Complaint) against Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc., filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields, Laura Metz.(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Entry of Order filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Order by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Tax Services of America, Inc. by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc. by Latonya Fields. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Jackson Hewitt, Inc. by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Class Action Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6454174.), filed by Tom Endres, Latonya Fields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shumadine, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endres et al v. Jackson Hewitt, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Fields
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Endres
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Metz
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?