Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company v. Rack, et al

Plaintiff: Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Benjamin C Banks, Carol Duval, Rack & Moccia, P.C., Kevin B. Rack and Benjamin C. Banks
Case Number: 2:2019cv00038
Filed: January 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gray Mauck on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Mauck, Andrew)
March 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #16 Notice of Appearance. The filing user's login does not match the signature on document number 16. The attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (jrin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Roberts Tannery on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Tannery, Melissa)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Carol Duval.(Kyber, Benjamin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William)
March 1, 2019 Notice of Correction re #13 Answer to Complaint. Document number 13 the filing user's login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing user's signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (jrin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company by Benjamin C. Banks.(Tannery, Melissa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service Upon Benjamin Banks by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
February 24, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Rack & Moccia, P.C. by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
February 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Carol Duval by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
February 24, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Kevin Rack by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Benjamin C. Banks, Carol Duval, Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin)
February 4, 2019 Notice of Correction re #5 , #6 , #4 , #3 Proposed Summons. Documents number 3, 4, 5, and 6 were filed using the wrong docket event. The "Proposed Summons" event was incorrectly filed as "Exhibit." The Clerk's Office has corrected this error. (jrin)
February 2, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Rack & Moccia, P.C. by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company.. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin).
February 2, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Kevin Rack by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin).
February 2, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Carol Duval by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin).
February 2, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Benjamin Banks by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin).
January 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
January 20, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
January 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6454499.), filed by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Danny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company v. Rack, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Danny Mark Howell
Represented By: Brandt Gerard Cordelli
Represented By: Robert Jackson Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Duval
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Kyber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rack & Moccia, P.C.
Represented By: William Thomas Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Rack
Represented By: William Thomas Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin C. Banks
Represented By: Melissa Roberts Tannery
Represented By: Andrew Gray Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?