Nutrients Plus, LLC v. Huber

Plaintiff: Nutrients Plus, LLC
Defendant: John Huber
Case Number: 2:2019cv00102
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by John Huber.(Theuer, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts III and IV filed by John Huber. (Theuer, James)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts III and IV by John Huber. (Theuer, James)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nutrients Plus, LLC of Change of Address of Counsel (Byers, Duncan)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File; defendant shall have to Monday, April 22, 2019, to file its responsive pleadings to theComplaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 04/16/2019. (tamarm)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 Consent MOTION for Extension to respond to Complaint filed by John Huber. (Attachments: #1 Email, #2 Email)(Theuer, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (tamarm, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension to respond to Complaint by John Huber. (Theuer, James)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrients Plus, LLC; John Huber served on 3/25/19. (bpet, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Huber. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
March 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Nutrients Plus, LLC. (Byers, Duncan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6521661.), filed by Nutrients Plus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Byers, Duncan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (epri, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrients Plus, LLC v. Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huber
Represented By: James Richard Theuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrients Plus, LLC
Represented By: Duncan Glover Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?