Larcombe v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brian Larcombe
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00252
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Allstate's Motion for a More Definite Statement, ECF No. 3, is GRANTED. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Complaint meeting the federal pleading requirements within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 6.28.19 Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 6/28/2019. (epri, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company re #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement Notice of Submission without Oral Argument (Reeser, Bradley)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sean Patrick Sullivan as to Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 5/16/19. (tlev, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sean Patrick Sullivan and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher R. Hedrick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6642068. by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application Sean Sullivan, #2 Affidavit Aff. Sean Sullivan, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Admission)(Hedrick, Christopher)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley David Reeser on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Reeser, Bradley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Plaintiff's counsel re: associating with local counsel. (epri, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
May 14, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support to #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hedrick, Christopher)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hedrick, Christopher)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hedrick, Christopher)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6639543.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint / Warrant in Debt, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit Pt. 1 - Independent Adjuster Report and Estimate, #5 Exhibit Pt. 2 - Independent Adjuster Report and Estimate, #6 Exhibit Payments, #7 Exhibit January Denial Letter, #8 Exhibit March Denial Letter, #9 Exhibit LOR & Invoice, #10 Exhibit SFIP)(Hedrick, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larcombe v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Roland Hedrick
Represented By: Sean Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Bradley David Reeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Larcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?