United States of America f/u/b/o Champco, Inc. v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Champco, Inc. t/a Power Electric Co. and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company and Watermark Environmental, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Champco Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00268
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Champco Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is granted, Champco, Inc. t/a Power Electric isgranted an extension of time to file its responsive pleading and shall file such responsive pleading by July 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/16/2019. (jrin)
July 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Krask. #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (jrin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Champco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Gordon, Jesse)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Arch Insurance Company. (Pocock, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Watermark Environmental, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Champco Inc. by Watermark Environmental, Inc., Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Documents)(Pocock, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Richard Pocock on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Watermark Environmental, Inc. (Pocock, Donald)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Arch Insurance Company and Watermark Environmental, Inc. served on 5/29/2019. (jrin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Watermark Environmental, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Watermark Environmental, Inc. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Arch Insurance Company by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (clou )
May 21, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been requested to refile the Civil Cover sheet using a non-fillable form and to file the Corporate Disclosure statement as a separate docket entry using its respective event. (epri, )
May 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6649512.), filed by Champco, Inc. t/a Power Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Corp. Disclosure)(Gordon, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America f/u/b/o Champco, Inc. v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champco, Inc. t/a Power Electric Co.
Represented By: Jesse Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Champco, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Brian Gordon
Represented By: Jack Rephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watermark Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Champco Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?