McBride v. George G. Sharp, Inc.

Plaintiff: Willie Morris McBride
Defendant: George G. Sharp, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00274
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by George G. Sharp, Inc.. (Constine, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM filed by Willie Morris McBride. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by George G. Sharp, Inc.. (Constine, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by George G. Sharp, Inc.. (Constine, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by George G. Sharp, Inc.. (Constine, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by George G. Sharp, Inc.. (Constine, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to George G. Sharp, Inc., served on 6/3/2019. (epri, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to George G. Sharp, Inc. Pro se plaintiff picked up service package from Clerk's office on 5.31.19. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to George G. Sharp, Inc., due to an incorrect Defendant address initially provided to the Court.(epri, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to George G. Sharp, Inc. Service package mailed to pro se plaintiff on 5.24.19. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George G. Sharp, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683042230.), filed by Willie Morris McBride. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Receipt)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride v. George G. Sharp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Morris McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George G. Sharp, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Constine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?