ALG Trustee, LLC v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: ALG Trustee, LLC and ALG Trustee, LLC, as substitute-trustee under that certain deed of trust dated and recorded among the land records for the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach on et al
Defendant: Ocean Lakes Condominium d/b/a Saddlewood, Ocean Lakes Community Association, Inc., Capital One Bank USA NA, Lawrence J Howard, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, TD Bank USA NA, The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service and Ocean Lakes Condominium
Case Number: 2:2019cv00276
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Entry of Default as to Lawrence Howard by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry of Default, #2 Second Declaration of Kieran O Carter, #3 Exhibit A - SCRA Report for Lawrence Howard)(Carter, Kieran)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Ocean Lakes Community Association, Inc., and TD Bank USA NA pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, for failure to file an answer in this action. This default is noted on the Court's docket this date. (jrin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Entry of Default as to Ocean Lakes Community Association Inc., Capital One Bank USA NA, and TD Bank USA NA by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Kieran O. Carter)(Carter, Kieran)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service Lawrence J Howard served on 4/22/2019, answer due 5/13/2019 (Carter, Kieran)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service Ocean Lakes Community Association, Inc. served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019 (Carter, Kieran)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service TD Bank USA NA served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019 (Carter, Kieran)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service Capital One Bank USA NA served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019 (Carter, Kieran)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. (Carter, Kieran)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ocean Lakes Condominium. (Koch, Barry)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Randolph Koch on behalf of Ocean Lakes Condominium (Koch, Barry)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ALG Trustee, LLC, as substitute-trustee under that certain deed of trust dated 10/25/02, and recorded among the land records for the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach on 1/28/05, et al. (Murphy, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Scott Murphy on behalf of ALG Trustee, LLC, as substitute-trustee under that certain deed of trust dated 10/25/02, and recorded among the land records for the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach on 1/28/05, et al (Murphy, Jason)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service.(Carter, Kieran)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Defendant's attorney - Ocean Lakes Condominium d/b/a Saddlewood - re: associating with local counsel. (jrin)
June 3, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendants Lawrence J. Howard, Ocean Lakes Community Association, Inc., Capital One Bank USA NA, TD Bank USA NA, The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures.A party seeking reasonable extension of time to respond to the complaint must obtain court approval by filing an appropriate motion with a proposed order. If a party is in default, plaintiff's counsel may file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The request for entry of default should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures (jrin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Carter, Kieran)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ocean Lakes Condominium. (epri, )
May 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal , filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Ocean Lakes Condominium d/b/a Saddlewood)(Carter, Kieran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALG Trustee, LLC v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Lakes Condominium d/b/a Saddlewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Lakes Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Represented By: Kent Pendleton Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Lakes Condominium
Represented By: Barry Randolph Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALG Trustee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALG Trustee, LLC, as substitute-trustee under that certain deed of trust dated and recorded among the land records for the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach on et al
Represented By: Jason Scott Murphy
Represented By: Brian Robert Sneath
Represented By: Devon Kaye Cipperly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?