Universal North America Insurance Company v. VML Insurance Programs et al

Plaintiff: Universal North American Insurance Company and Universal North America Insurance Co.
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, VML Insurance Programs, Cade Anderson, City of Virginia Beach School Board and Virginia Risk Sharing Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00322
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of Virginia Beach School Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cade Anderson)(Lahren, Anne)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Anderson's Reply filed by Cade Anderson. (Moore, Sally)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for summary judgment, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Universal North America Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rule 56(d) Affidavit)(Matheson, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Universal North America Insurance Co. All Defendants (Matheson, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re #17 Memorandum in Support, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #15 Notice of Appearance. Document numbers 15 - 17 have a caption, and/or style that does not correspond to the case in which you filed. Attorney advised to be sure that the caption and/or style of all pleadings match the caption and/or style of the docket and Complaint filed in this case and that if a party's name needs to be changed to file an appropriate motion to change the name. Also, there were blank pages included in these documents. Attorney notified to be sure that no blank pages are included in future filings. (tamarm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Cade Anderson. (Moore, Sally) (Main Document 17 replaced to delete blank pages on 7/25/2019) (tamarm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Cade Anderson. (Moore, Sally) (Main Document 16 replaced to delete blank pages on 7/25/2019) (tamarm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Jean Moore on behalf of Cade Anderson (Moore, Sally)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by VML Insurance Programs. (Mumford, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by VML Insurance Programs.(Mumford, John)
July 24, 2019 Notice of Correction re 12 Summons Returned Executed. Filer notified that the summons form needs to be filed and that the documents submitted as ECF #12 should be attachments to the Summons Returned Executed event. (tamarm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Universal North America Insurance Co. All Defendants (Matheson, Michael) Modified on 7/26/2019 - document refiled - See ECF #18 (tamarm).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by City of Virginia Beach School Board. (Lahren, Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for summary judgment filed by City of Virginia Beach School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Response to Request for Admission)(Lahren, Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the alternative for summary judgment by City of Virginia Beach School Board. (Lahren, Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Catherine Lahren on behalf of City of Virginia Beach School Board (Lahren, Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Hoyt Matthews on behalf of City of Virginia Beach School Board (Matthews, Richard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Mumford, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Mumford, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cade Anderson, City of Virginia Beach School Board, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, VML Insurance Programs. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar)
June 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (afar)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Matheson, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Matheson, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6697284.), filed by Universal North America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matheson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal North America Insurance Company v. VML Insurance Programs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal North American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Gordon Matheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal North America Insurance Co.
Represented By: Michael Gordon Matheson
Represented By: Henry Cannon Spalding, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VML Insurance Programs
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cade Anderson
Represented By: Sally Jean Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Virginia Beach School Board
Represented By: Richard Hoyt Matthews
Represented By: Anne Catherine Lahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Risk Sharing Association
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?