Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG v. K2M Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: K2M Group Holdings, Inc. and K2M, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00325
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 ALL FUTURE DOCKET ENTRIES WILL BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE, 2:18cv585. (clou )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER : the Court hereby ORDERS the consolidation of case 2:18cv585 and case 2:19cv325. See order for details. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 7/24/2019. (clou )
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG re #25 Order, (Biedermann's Responsive Brief In Support Of Motion To Consolidate Related Patent Infringement Matters) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration re #28 Reply Declaration of Gregory S. Gewirtz in Support of Defendants' Reply in Opposition to Consolidation by K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McGraw, Wendy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 Reply to #26 NOTICE Defendants' Reply in Opposition to Consolidation of Separate Patent Suits filed by K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc.. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum of Defendants Opposing Consolidation of Separate Patent Suits to #25 Order, filed by K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc.. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG re #25 Order, (Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate Related Patent Infringement Matters) (Noona, Stephen)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - counsel are INSTRUCTED to file simultaneous briefs addressing the propriety of consolidation, no later than Friday July 19, 2019. Simultaneous responsive briefs shall be filed no later than Tuesday, July 23, 2019. See order for specific details. Copies distributed as directed. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 7/15/2019. (clou)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice for Edward Charles Donovan as to Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 07/12/19. (tlev, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sharre Lotfollahi as to Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 07/12/19. (tlev, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice for Luke Lucien Dauchot as to Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 07/12/19. (tlev, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Scott Mammen on behalf of Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG (Mammen, Nathan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Gregory S Gewirtz as to K2M Group Holdings, Inc. and K2M, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 7/11/19. (tlev, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward Charles Donovan and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734472. by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharre Lotfollahi and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734455. by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Luke Lucien Dauchot and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734442. by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
July 11, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Martin Tata on behalf of K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc. (Tata, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S. Gewirtz and Certification of Local Counsel Wendy C. McGraw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6731512. by K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc.. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by K2M Group Holdings, Inc.. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by K2M, Inc.. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint for Patent Infringement by K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc..(McGraw, Wendy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Cohen McGraw on behalf of K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc. (McGraw, Wendy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG K2M Group Holdings, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Noona, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. K2M, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Noona, Stephen) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (clou).
June 21, 2019 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:19cv802. (afar)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER administratively transferring case to the Norfolk Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 06/20/2019. (choy, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to K2M Group Holdings, Inc., K2M, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Notice to Attorney)(aott)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent 9,597,121. (aott)
June 17, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG re #1 Complaint (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark) (Noona, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for K2M, Inc. by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for K2M Group Holdings, Inc. by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Noona, Stephen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6695018.), filed by Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noona, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG v. K2M Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biedermann Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Edward Charles Donovan
Represented By: Sharre Lotfollahi
Represented By: Nathan Scott Mammen
Represented By: Luke Lucien Dauchot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K2M Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory S Gewirtz
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K2M, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory S Gewirtz
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?