CMA CGM, S.A. v. Millenium Marine Corp.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM, S.A.
Defendant: Millenium Marine Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00356
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (bboy, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) by Millenium Marine Corp..(Sump, David)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave, and ORDERS the Defendant to refile the Answer and Affirmative Defenses attached to its Motion within 5 days from the date of this Order as to Millenium Marine Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/3/19. (afar)
August 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) (bboy, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) filed by Millenium Marine Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Sump, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) by Millenium Marine Corp.. (Sump, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Millenium Marine Corp.. (Sump, David)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Harlen Sump on behalf of Millenium Marine Corp. (Sump, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendant. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures.A party seeking reasonable extension of time to respond to the complaint must obtain court approval by filing an appropriate motion with a proposed order. If a party is in default, plaintiff's counsel may file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The request for entry of default should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. (bboy, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMA CGM, S.A. Millenium Marine Corp. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019 (Berkley, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hani Barghash, RA on 07/24/2019, filed by CMA CGM, S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Millenium Marine Corp.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CMA CGM, S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by CMA CGM, S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. Filing user has been requested to file the Financial Disclosure Statement, filed at 1-16, as a separate filing using its respective event. (epri, )
July 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6729756.), filed by CMA CGM, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Financial Disclosure)(Berkley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM, S.A. v. Millenium Marine Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millenium Marine Corp.
Represented By: David Harlen Sump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM, S.A.
Represented By: Thomas Saunders Berkley
Represented By: Jeffrey Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?