CMA CGM S.A. v. Leader Int'l Express Corp. aka Leader International Express, Inc.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Defendant: Leader Int'l Express Corp. and Leader International Express
Case Number: 2:2019cv00357
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller & filed on 8/29/19. (ptom, )
August 27, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Leader Int'l Express Corp..(Henderson, Marissa)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's answer/response due 8/27/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 8/15/19. (bpet, )
August 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. (bpet, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Leader Int'l Express Corp.. (Henderson, Marissa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Leader Int'l Express Corp. (Henderson, Marissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (bpet, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CMA CGM S.A. Leader Int'l Express Corp. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019 (Berkley, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jim Hsieh, RA on 07/24/2019, filed by CMA CGM S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Leader Int'l Express Corp. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil motions procedures) (bpet, )
July 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by CMA CGM S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CMA CGM S.A.. (Berkley, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6731035.), filed by CMA CGM S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit 3B, #6 Exhibit 3C, #7 Exhibit 3D, #8 Exhibit 3E, #9 Exhibit 3F, #10 Exhibit 4A-C, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11)(Berkley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM S.A. v. Leader Int'l Express Corp. aka Leader International Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leader Int'l Express Corp.
Represented By: Marissa Marriott Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leader International Express
Represented By: Marissa Marriott Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Represented By: Thomas Saunders Berkley
Represented By: Jeffrey Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?