Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alverina Brown and Alverina Lopez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Samuel I. White, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00399
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 30 Letter to Portsmouth Circuit Court. (dcou, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: This Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of Portsmouth, Virginia and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is now MOOT. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 9/23/2019. Certified copy of Order mailed to Portsmouth Circuit Court on 9/24/2019. (dcou, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 28 Opposition To Defendant Samuel I White, P.C.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alverina Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (dcou, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply for reasonable cause shown. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank shall file the amended reply not later than September 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 09/10/2019. (Krask, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Reply)(Jones, Maryia)
September 9, 2019 Notice of Correction re #24 Amended Reply to Response to Motion: Unfortunately, when you filed document number 24 you needed leave of court to file the document. The proposed document should have been an attachment to a motion for leave to file. Please file a motion with the proposed document as an attachment to the motion. (dcou, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia) Modified docket text and docket relationship on 9/9/2019 (dcou, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim styled as Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintif filed by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kim, Lisa)
September 4, 2019 Notice of Correction re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim styled as Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff: Unfortunately, document number 21 contains the brief in support as an exhibit to the main document. The brief in support and opposition should be submitted as a separate docket entry, rather than as an exhibit. Please re-file the brief with the Exhibits separately and link it back to the motion. (dcou, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim styled as Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Defendant, Samuel I. White, P.C.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kim, Lisa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Guillot, Jr on behalf of Samuel I. White, P.C. (Guillot, Ronald)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Alverina Brown. (Thompson, Heath)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Convert or Deem Demurrer into Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6. Defendant is directed to file any Motion to Dismiss separately and consistent with the standards set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on August 26, 2019.
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand. See order for details. Copies distributed as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 8/23/2019. (clou)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time filed by Alverina Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand.: It is ORDERED that any response to plaintiffs motion for extension of time, ECF No. 11, must be filed no later than noon on August 22, 2019, and plaintiffs reply must be filed no later than noon on August 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 8/20/2019. (dcou, )
August 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand. (dcou, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand. filed by Alverina Brown. (Thompson, Heath)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until Ruling on Remand. by Alverina Brown. (Thompson, Heath)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alverina Brown. (Thompson, Heath)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alverina Brown. (Thompson, Heath)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Styled as Motion to Convert Demurrer into Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Samuel I. White, P.C. by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demurrer and MCO)(Kim, Lisa)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C - Face-to-face correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Foreclosure Sale)(Jones, Maryia)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
July 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Samuel I. White, P.C. re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Consent to Remove (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Demurrer and MCO)(Kim, Lisa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Kim, Lisa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6764269.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal #4 Civil Cover Sheet (Jones, Maryia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alverina Brown
Represented By: Heath J Thompson
Represented By: Michelle Ann Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alverina Lopez
Represented By: Heath J Thompson
Represented By: Michelle Ann Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kendall Hamilton Tan
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel I. White, P.C.
Represented By: Lisa Hudson Kim
Represented By: Ronald James Guillot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?