Harris v. City of Virginia Beach et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Elliott Harris
Defendant: Hon. Teresa N. Hammon, Officer P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, David M. O'Dell, Officer T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr., Officer A.N. Murawski, VBPD, City of Virginia Beach, Sgt. B. Jackson, VBPD, Colin Stolle and Hon. Elizabeth S. Hodges
Case Number: 2:2019cv00408
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 43 Submission by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD. (Harris, Gerald)
November 13, 2019 Filing 41 Response to #40 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of Statutes and Motion to Intervene filed by City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Clarence Elliott Harris)(Keffer, Kathleen)
October 30, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE OF STATUTES AND MOTION TO INTERVENE IN SUPPORT OF 42 U.S.C. S 1983 COMPLAINT by Clarence Elliott Harris (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S O'DELL, HODGES AND HAMMONS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b) (l) AND 12(b) (6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SECOND REOUEST FOR PROOF OF HAZARD AND/OR MALPRACTICE INSURANCE, #28 , filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COLIN STOLLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b) (6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SECOND REQUEST FOR PROOF OF HAZARD AND/OR MALPRACTICE INSURANCE, #30 filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT by Clarence Elliott Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(epri, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD. (Harris, Gerald)
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD. (Harris, Gerald)
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 Waiver of re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Oral Argument by Colin Stolle (Rosen, Jeff)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Colin Stolle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosen, Jeff)
October 25, 2019 Filing 31 Roseboro Notice by Colin Stolle (Rosen, Jeff)
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Colin Stolle. (Rosen, Jeff)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. filed by Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, David M. O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified GDC Records, #2 Exhibit Certified Circuit Court Record)(McEntee, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, David M. O'Dell. (McEntee, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 27 Roseboro Notice by Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, David M. O'Dell (McEntee, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD, David M. O'Dell, Colin Stolle, filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2)(epri, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, ECF No. 22, is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's proposed Amended Complaint and exhibits, currently docketed at ECF Nos. 22-1 through 22-6, as a separate entry on the docket of this matter. Mr. Stolle's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 15, is DISMISSED as moot, and the remaining Defendants need not respond to Plaintiff's initial Complaint. All Defendants are ORDERED to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within twenty-one days from the date of entry of this Order. This Order docketed in the court's electronic filing system as DIRECTED on 10.7.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/4/2019. (epri, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clarence Elliott Harris (epri, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Clarence Elliott Harris.
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Amend the Complaint by Clarence Elliott Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D part 1, #6 Exhibit D part 2) (epri, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COLIN STOLLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)6 FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 2 BY WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED AND REOUEST FOR PROOF OF HAZARD AND/OR MALPRACTICE INSURANCE by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT COLIN STOLLE UNDER RULE 12(b) (6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BY WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED AND REOUEST FOR PROOF OF HAZARD PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY AND/OR LAWYERS MALPRACTICE BOND INSURANCE filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B McEntee, III on behalf of Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, David M. O'Dell (McEntee, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Colin Stolle (Rosen, Jeff)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by Colin Stolle (Rosen, Jeff)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Colin Stolle. (Rosen, Jeff)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Colin Stolle. (Rosen, Jeff)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Virginia Beach waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; P.E. Greenfield, VBPD waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; B. Jackson, VBPD waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; A.N. Murawski, VBPD waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colin Stolle. Colin Stolle waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Rosen, Jeff)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Abbott Keffer on behalf of City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD (Keffer, Kathleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Boynton on behalf of City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD (Boynton, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Cameron Brown on behalf of Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, David M. O'Dell (Brown, Calvin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elizabeth S. Hodges. Elizabeth S. Hodges waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Brown, Calvin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teresa N. Hammon. Teresa N. Hammon waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Brown, Calvin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David M. O'Dell. David M. O'Dell waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Brown, Calvin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Wayne Rosen on behalf of Colin Stolle (Rosen, Jeff)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Logan Harris on behalf of City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD (Harris, Gerald)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Clarence Elliott Harris. (epri, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against City of Virginia Beach, P.E. Greenfield, VBPD, Teresa N. Hammon, Elizabeth S. Hodges, B. Jackson, VBPD, T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr, A.N. Murawski, VBPD, David M. O'Dell, Colin Stolle, filed by Clarence Elliott Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(epri, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint and E-Noticing Request. The Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service form for Defendants. A copy of the Complaint, this Order, the Notice of Lawsuit, and two copies of the Waiver of Service form are to be sent to each Defendant at the addresses provided by Plaintiff. If any Defendant fails to waive service, the Clerk is DIRECTED to: (i) issue summons, (ii) prepare a packet containing a summons, a copy of the Complaint, and this Order for any such Defendant, and (iii) deliver the packet to the United States Marshal, who is DIRECTED to serve the packet upon any such Defendant. Plaintiff's E-Noticing Request is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Plaintiff's e-mail address to this case, and docket this Order in the court's electronic filing system. Order docketed as DIRECTED on 8.15.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 8/15/2019. (epri, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clarence Elliott Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed E-Noticing Motion)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. City of Virginia Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Teresa N. Hammon
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Represented By: Robert B McEntee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer P.E. Greenfield, VBPD
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Kathleen Abbott Keffer
Represented By: Mark Douglas Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. O'Dell
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Represented By: Robert B McEntee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer T.W. Lipsey, VBPD, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Kathleen Abbott Keffer
Represented By: Mark Douglas Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer A.N. Murawski, VBPD
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Kathleen Abbott Keffer
Represented By: Mark Douglas Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Virginia Beach
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Kathleen Abbott Keffer
Represented By: Mark Douglas Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. B. Jackson, VBPD
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Kathleen Abbott Keffer
Represented By: Mark Douglas Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Stolle
Represented By: Jeff Wayne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Elizabeth S. Hodges
Represented By: Calvin Cameron Brown
Represented By: Robert B McEntee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Elliott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?