Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. v. M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851)
Plaintiff: Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.
Defendant: M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851)
Claimant: Dong Lien Maritime S.A. Panama
Case Number: 2:2019cv00444
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
2 Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. (Stillman, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Marshal's Return of Process Receipt and Return Executed (afar)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 9/4/19. (bpet, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Joint by Dong Lien Maritime S.A. Panama, Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (Brogan, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Dong Lien Maritime S.A. Panama re #17 Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,, (Coberly, Mark)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. re #19 Memorandum in Support, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brogan, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,, filed by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Lien to Nordic, #2 Exhibit 2-CH6, #3 Exhibit 3-CH7)(Brogan, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re #17 Order on Motion to Quash,,,,,, by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (Brogan, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall wire $513,720.00 US Dollars allegedly promised by plaintiff to Shipowner no later than 8/30/19 12:00 pm EST. The parties shall electronically file a Status Report with the Court no later than 3:00 pm EST on 8/30/19. If Plaintiff fails to make this payment, the arrest of the Vessel shall be vacated effective at the expiration of this time frame. 2) If the Plaintiff makes the required payment, Shipowner may secure the release of the Vessel by posting security with this Court in the amount of $2,000,000. Upon filing said security, the arrest will be vacated. The parties shall electronically file a Status Report with the Court no later than 3:00 pm EST on Tuesday, 9/3/19. 3) If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the payment required by this Order, the Court's Arrest Order will be vacated at 12:01 EST on Friday, August 30, 2019. The parties shall immediately notify the Court and the USM electronically, if Plaintiff makes the payment required by this Order, or fails to make the payment required by this Order. 4) The Shipowner shall have 14 days from 9/3/19 to file a motion and brief explaining whether the security bond should be remitted. b) Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the date it is served with Shipowner's motion to file its reply brief. c) Shipowner shall have 5 days from the date it is served with Plaintiff's reply brief to file a rebuttal brief. The parties are Directed that they shall contact the CRD to set a hearing no earlier than 3 business days after the briefing schedule outlined.Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/29/19. (Copy distributed as directed 8/29/19) (afar)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Motion Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 8/29/2019. Appearances: Patrick M. Brogan appeared for the Plaintiff. Dustin M. Paul and Mark T. Coberly appeared for the Defendant. Motion hearing as to #11 Emergency Motion to Vacate the Order of Arrest, Request for Expedited Hearing pursuant to Admiralty Rule E(4)(f), and for Attorneys Fees and Costs. Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. The Court FINDS probable cause to arrest the vessel and fixes the bond at $2,000,000.00. The Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $513,720.00 charter within 24 hours. Once the charter is paid, the Defendant will post the bond, also within 24 hours. If the charter is not paid, the Court will vacate the arrest. The Court will issue an order explaining its ruling in more detail. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 Emergency MOTION to Quash With Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - #mail communication, #2 Exhibit 2 - email communication, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bills of Lading)(Brogan, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851). (Coberly, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #11 Emergency MOTION to Quash With Request for Expedited Hearing set for 8/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Mitchell Paul on behalf of M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851) (Paul, Dustin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 Emergency MOTION to Quash With Request for Expedited Hearing filed by M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Coberly, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION to Quash With Request for Expedited Hearing by M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851). (Coberly, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM AND RESTRICTED APPEARANCE OF DISPONENT OWNER by M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851). (Coberly, Mark)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest issued and delivered to USM (afar)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion Allowing the Vessel to Move Within Port. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/26/19. (afar)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion Appointing Substitute Custodian. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/26/19. (afar)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/26/19. (afar)
August 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Allow the Vessel to Move Within the Port by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. (afar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for an Order Appointing Substitute Custodian by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (afar) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Declaration) (afar, ).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (afar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement as to Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. filed. (afar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683043096.), filed by Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Letter, #6 Receipt)(afar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD. v. M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Eternity SW (IMO 9425851)
Represented By: Mark T. Coberly
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dry Bulk Singapore PTE, LTD.
Represented By: Daniel Truitt Stillman
Represented By: Patrick Michael Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dong Lien Maritime S.A. Panama
Represented By: Mark T. Coberly
Represented By: Dustin Mitchell Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?