Fakunmoju et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Olatunji Moshood Fakunmoju and Malinda Leigh Owumi
Defendant: Equity Trustee, LLC, BWW Law Group, LLC and Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00487
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Equity Trustee, LLC. (epri, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BWW Law Group, LLC, served on 11/12/2019. (epri, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bayview Loan Servicing Florida address, served on 11/12/2019. (epri, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Richmond address, served on 11/12/2019. (epri, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC re Registered Agent in Richmond, pursuant to Plaintiff's request. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to BWW Law Group, LLC, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Equity Trustee, LLC. Service packages mailed to pro se plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.4.19. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Because Mr. Fakunmoju and Ms. Owumi paid the requisite filing fees, the IFP Application,ECF No. 1, is DISMISSED as moot. Because the specific relief sought in the proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction {i.e., the prevention of the foreclosure sale) has been rendered moot by subsequent events, the motion is DISMISSED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to (i) issue summons; (ii) prepare a service packet for each Defendant that contains a summons, a copy of the Amended Complaint, and a copy of this Order; and (iii) send the service packets to Mr. Fakunmoju and Ms. Owumi via U.S. Mail.A copy of this Order was sent as DIRECTED on 11.4.19. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/4/2019. (epri, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BWW Law Group, LLC, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Equity Trustee, LLC, filed by Olatunji Moshood Fakunmoju, Malinda Leigh Owumi. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Receipt)(epri, )
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: To the extent Ms. Owumi wishes to proceed as a Plaintiff in this litigation, Ms. Owumi is ORDERED to sign and refile the proposed Complaint within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order, and represent her own interests (or obtain counsel) throughout the duration of this lawsuit. A copy of this Order, along with a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), sent to Mr. Fakunmoju and Ms. Owumi as DIRECTED on 9.20.19. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 9/20/2019. (epri, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Olatunji Moshood Fakunmoju, Malinda Leigh Owumi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachments, #3 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fakunmoju et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olatunji Moshood Fakunmoju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Leigh Owumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Trustee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWW Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?