Doss v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Mr. Jeremy Doss and Jeremy Doss
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00502
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial is set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Further, the court notes the appearance of Jonathan Hogins, Esquire, as counsel of record for the plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on November 15, 2019. (sche)
November 15, 2019 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 11/15/2019. (sche)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Alexander Spain on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Spain, Brett)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on October 23, 2019. (sche)
October 21, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (tamarm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.. (Kushner, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Co..(Kushner, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter)(tamarm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Co. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
September 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jeremy Doss. (Thompson, Nicholas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6851541.), filed by Jeremy Doss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Represented By: David Aaron Kushner
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jeremy Doss
Represented By: Nicholas Delton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Doss
Represented By: Nicholas Delton Thompson
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Hogins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?