Martin v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia R. Martin
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00543
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Hearing by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Stephens, Edwin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Reply to #13 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Cynthia R. Martin. (Martingayle, Kevin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Stephens, Edwin)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 and the Bench Trial is set for 6/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 11/19/19. (lbax, )
November 14, 2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on 11/14/2019. Kevin E. Martingayle appeared for the Plaintiff. Edwin F. Stephens appeared for the Defendant. (lbax, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Stephens, Edwin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Cynthia R. Martin. (Martingayle, Kevin)
November 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re #9 Memorandum in Opposition: Unfortunately, document number 9 is a brief in opposition and in support of separate motions. (As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the same document separately for each pleading) Please refile the document again as a Memorandum in Opposition and link it back to the Motion for Judgment [ECF 6]. Also, the memorandum in opposition that you filed was linked back to [ECF 8], Motion for Judgment which should reflect in support instead of in opposition. The Clerk's Office will correct the docket text of that entry. (afar, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , filed by Cynthia R. Martin. (Martingayle, Kevin) Modified text on 11/7/2019 (afar).
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Cynthia R. Martin. (Martingayle, Kevin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support to #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stephens, Edwin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on October 24, 2019. (sche)
October 9, 2019 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
October 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (epri, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Stephens, Edwin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6878492.), filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia R. Martin
Represented By: Kevin Edward Martingayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?