United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation v. Watermark Environmental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company and Watermark Environmental, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00544
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at the courthouse in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/5/19 and filed on 12/6/19. (lhow)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 , a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as follows: for good cause shown, James L. Johnsen has withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Tindall Corporation and is terminated as counsel of record. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/3/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James L. Johnsen by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnsen, James)
November 13, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Insurance Company, Watermark Environmental, Inc..(Gill, S.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation: Arch Insurance Company served on 10/22/19; Watermark Environmental, Inc. served on 10/22/19. (bpet, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Darrell Lehman as certified by local counsel James L. Johnsen for Tindall Corporation. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/16/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Watermark Environmental, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony D. Lehman and Certification of Local Counsel James L. Johnsen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6880944. by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Johnsen, James)
October 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Johnsen, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Johnsen, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Johnsen, James)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6880807.), filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnsen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation v. Watermark Environmental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Tindall Corporation
Represented By: James Lange Johnsen
Represented By: W. Ryan Snow
Represented By: Anthony Darrell Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: S. Sadiq Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watermark Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: S. Sadiq Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?