ZBZ & Associates, Inc. v. Noah Enterprises, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: ZBZ & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Noah Enterprises, Inc. and Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00655
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 1/16/20. (lbax, )
January 14, 2020 Refer for 16(b) (clou )
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Tuckman, Adam)
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Noah Enterprises, Inc..(Hearne, David)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Tuckman, Adam)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Noah Enterprises, Inc.. (Hearne, David)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer/response by defendants Noah Enterprises, Inc., and Westfield Insurance Company due by 1/14/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/31/19. (bpet, )
December 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (clou )
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tuckman, Adam)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZBZ & Associates, Inc. Westfield Insurance Company served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 (Holland, Kelley)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZBZ & Associates, Inc. Noah Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 (Holland, Kelley)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Westfield Insurance Company, CT Corporation System served on Katie Bush on 12/10/2019, filed by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Holland, Kelley)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Noah Enterprises, Inc. VB Business Services, LLC served on Barbara Khan on 12/09/2019, filed by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Holland, Kelley)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Westfield Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedure) (clou )
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Noah Enterprises, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedure) (clou )
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Holland, Kelley)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Holland, Kelley)
December 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Holland, Kelley)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966457.), filed by ZBZ & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Holland, Kelley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZBZ & Associates, Inc. v. Noah Enterprises, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: David Allen Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Michael Tuckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZBZ & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Kelley Christian Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?