Curtis Contracting, Inc. v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Plaintiff: Curtis Contracting, Inc. and THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Curtis Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Petitioner: Joint Forces Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00675
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Hearing by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC, The Guarantee Company of North America USA re #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Stay , #7 Counterclaim,,, #5 First MOTION to Intervene , #6 Memorandum in Support (Hearne, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay , #5 First MOTION to Intervene filed by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC, The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hearne, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Intervene filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Curtis Contracting, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 Opposition to #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies filed by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Curtis Contracting, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by The Guarantee Company of North America USA.(Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Exhibit re #8 MOTION to Stay , #5 First MOTION to Intervene Proposed Order filed by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Hearne, David) Modified docket text on 1/8/2020 (clou ).
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Stay , #5 First MOTION to Intervene filed by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed COUNTERCLAIM Joint Forces Contracting, LLC against Curtis Contracting, Inc. re #5 Motion to Intervene and #6 Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract)(Hearne, David) Modified docket text on 1/8/2020 (clou ).
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION to Intervene filed by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Hearne, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Intervene by Joint Forces Contracting, LLC. (Hearne, David)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Guarantee Company of North America USA. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
December 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Curtis Contracting, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Curtis Contracting, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6984596.), filed by Curtis Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Contracting, Inc. v. The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: James Richard Harvey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the use and benefit of Curtis Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: James Richard Harvey, III
Represented By: Jonathan Vincent Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: David Allen Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joint Forces Contracting, LLC
Represented By: David Allen Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?