Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Geico General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Defendant: Laura Wells, Geico General Insurance Company, Maureen O'Brien and Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Maureen O'Brien with Roseboro,. by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hartin, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 Roseboro Notice as to Maureen OBrien by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Hartin, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Maureen O'Brien with Roseboro,. by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Clerk to plaintiff's counsel requesting status report regarding responsive pleadings not being filed as to defendant Maureen O'Brien. (tamarm, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Geico General Insurance Company served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tamarm, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Louise Turner on behalf of Laura Wells (Turner, Amanda)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico General Insurance Company.(Glass, Dalton)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company Laura Wells served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (ptom, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Maureen O'Brien served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (ptom, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (ptom, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc..(Carroll, Adam)
January 20, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc.. (Carroll, Adam)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Carroll on behalf of Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc. (Carroll, Adam)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Laura Wells. (Fiorella, Todd)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Laura Wells.(Fiorella, Todd)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Hartin, Scott)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7005879.), filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company v. Geico General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Collins Hartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Wells
Represented By: Todd Michael Fiorella
Represented By: Amanda Louise Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company
Represented By: Dalton Lewis Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Systems Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Michael Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?