Lowman et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased and Natalya Lowman
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., McNeil-PPC, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00156
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall have until May 12, 2020, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 04/22/2020. (bboy, )
April 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (bboy, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Morris, Mitchell)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Natalya Lowman, Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased.(Sheldon, Justin)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Andrew David Tharp as to Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/1/20. (tlev, )
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael Bradford Hewes as to Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/1/20. (tlev, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., McNeil-PPC, Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., McNeil-PPC, Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew David Tharp and Certification of Local Counsel Mitchell Kirks Morris Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7142250. by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bradford Hewes and Certification of Local Counsel Mitchell K. Morris Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7140030. by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Matthew Sheldon on behalf of Natalya Lowman, Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased (Sheldon, Justin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Biniazan on behalf of Natalya Lowman, Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased (Biniazan, Kevin)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Arnold Breit on behalf of Natalya Lowman, Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased (Breit, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by McNeil-PPC, Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Johnson & Johnson. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 25, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing user has been directed to file a Financial Disclosure statement within 7 days. (epri, )
March 25, 2020 Notice of Correction re #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Filing user directed to attach Civil Cover Sheet to initiating document in future case filings. (epri, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
March 25, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Morris, Mitchell)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7135334.), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morris, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowman et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Kirks Morris
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Michael Bradford Hewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell Kirks Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Represented By: Mitchell Kirks Morris
Represented By: Andrew David Tharp
Represented By: Michael Bradford Hewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Lowman, as Adminstrator Administrator of the Estate of M.G., Deceased
Represented By: William David Breit
Represented By: Jeffrey Arnold Breit
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Represented By: Justin Matthew Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Lowman
Represented By: William David Breit
Represented By: Jeffrey Arnold Breit
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Represented By: Justin Matthew Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?