BARNES v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Barnes
Defendant: Colonel William Smith, Captain T. Blair and Dr. Taylor
Case Number: 2:2020cv00230
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:20-cv-03083. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia; Clerk of the Court shall CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/1/2020. (tf, n.m.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/7/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Amendment to #1 Complaint Received by LORENZO BARNES. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/7/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Envelope)(cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 5/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain T. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?