Jennings v. U.S. Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings and Mustafa Bey
Respondent: U.S. Government, U.S. of America, U.S. Homeland Security and U.S. Marshals
Case Number: 2:2020cv00276
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Eastern District of North Carolina Case No. 5:20hc2084 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-hc-02084. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The court finds that the interests of justice require that the action be transferred to the appropriate forum. Thus, the court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/29/2020. Copy of order sent to petitioner via U.S. Mail. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for petition review. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via U.S. Mail to Brandon Marquis Jennings at Piedmont Regional Jail. (Poole, A) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/2/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. U.S. Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mustafa Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?