Jones v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Danny Lynn Jones
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00349
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01083. Original file and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/29/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION (Joint Notice of Stipulation for Transfer to the United States District Court for the E.D. of Virginia - Proposed Order Submitted) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C... (Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, First Amended by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C..(Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S OPPOSED #54 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/15/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Extend Deadline Motion to Stay Proceeding, and Rule on Expedited Basis by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email)(Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendant's Opposed Motion to Transfer - Proposd Order Submitted) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A - Secretary of State Filing)(Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Joseph Nance, #2 Exhibit Consent of Shayna Shaw)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #50 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/4/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 MOTION to Certify Class proposed order submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Shreves, Darin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kaitlin Babb, #2 Exhibit Consent of Tonji King, #3 Exhibit Consent of April D. Williams, #4 Exhibit Consent of Taylor Wright)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #45 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/2/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (proposed order submitted) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Chain)(Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 46 Please disregard this entry and see DE#47 for the corrected filing (per e-mail to Helpdesk). RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (proposed order submitted) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Hulla, Patrick) Modified on 5/29/2020 (cdi). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING #15 MOTION TO DISMISS NON-TENNESSEE WORKERS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/28/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41 Without Prejudice by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-TN Opt-Ins)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Certify Class proposed order submitted by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Vincent Curatola, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Emma Griswell, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Caitlyn McKinley, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Samantha Johnson, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Danny Jones, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Garrett Lawson, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Duckworth Yakamisha, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Christina Hopkins, #9 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent, #10 Exhibit Text Notice, #11 Exhibit Robinson v. On-Call Staffing)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Veronica Belloso, #2 Exhibit Consent of Malissah Garcia, #3 Exhibit Consent of Stevie Patridge, #4 Exhibit Consent of Cherie L. Witherspoon)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Teresa Anguiano, #2 Exhibit Consent of Raul Belloso, Jr., #3 Exhibit Consent of Raul Belloso, #4 Exhibit Consent of Felicia Collins, #5 Exhibit Consent of Hilda Lopez Salazar, #6 Exhibit Consent of Sierra Lovato, #7 Exhibit Consent of Aimee Mandalupe, #8 Exhibit Consent of Angela Murillo Perez, #9 Exhibit Consent of Esmeralda Salgado)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Shemika Blue, #2 Exhibit Consent of Romana Leyva, #3 Exhibit Consent of Lynette Moseby, #4 Exhibit Consent of Cheryl L. Robinson)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Natasha Ford, #2 Exhibit Consent of Emerald M. Guess Campbell)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Monique Carrington, #2 Exhibit Consent of Sarah Hauke, #3 Exhibit Consent of Tasha Henderson, #4 Exhibit Consent of Keturah Houston, #5 Exhibit Consent of Lanisha Owens, #6 Exhibit Consent of Tracie Pinkins, #7 Exhibit Consent of Marcial Rivera, #8 Exhibit Consent of Kimberly D. Williams)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Amin Barton, #2 Exhibit Consent of Josh Hankins, #3 Exhibit Consent of Renarda Hunter)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Alphonso Brooks, #2 Exhibit Consent of Tiara Burney, #3 Exhibit Consent of Lakeisha Butler, #4 Exhibit Consent of Emily Glisson, #5 Exhibit Consent of Hilton Graham, #6 Exhibit Consent of Mishayla R. Hawkins, #7 Exhibit Consent of Kendrick D. Pearson)(Alexander, William) (Attachment 1 "Exhibit Consent of Alphonso Brooks" found to be corrupt on 6/29/2020, and replaced with note of this) (cbs). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jamie Brooks, #2 Exhibit Consent of Juanita Ford, #3 Exhibit Consent of Anquonita McDonald, #4 Exhibit Consent of Trequaun Slade, #5 Exhibit Consent of Megan Stovall, #6 Exhibit Consent of Jessica Swoveland, #7 Exhibit Consent of Dianne Tatem, #8 Exhibit Consent of Leomia Wade-Walker)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Keosha Richmond, #2 Exhibit Consent of Tiffany Taylor)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jordan Barnes, #2 Exhibit Consent of Terri Clay, #3 Exhibit Consent of Tiffany M. Corbett, #4 Exhibit Consent of Breasha Dallas, #5 Exhibit Consent of Ky'eshia Herbin, #6 Exhibit Consent of Brionna D. Johnson, #7 Exhibit Consent of Kelshell Matthews, #8 Exhibit Consent of Angela McBroom, #9 Exhibit Consent of Brandon Miles, #10 Exhibit Consent of Tequila Moore, #11 Exhibit Consent of Janeshia Norman, #12 Exhibit Consent of Malik Perkins, #13 Exhibit Consent of Tiarra Poteat, #14 Exhibit Consent of Courtney Purcell, #15 Exhibit Consent of Tamika J. Riley, #16 Exhibit Consent of Shatina Townsend, #17 Exhibit Consent of Shalan Tye, #18 Exhibit Consent of Latiana Roberta Walker, #19 Exhibit Consent of Whitney Warren, #20 Exhibit Consent of Ashley Wilkerson)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Zady Kay, #2 Exhibit Consent of Starla Singleton)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/6/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3340812) by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Federal, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State)(Anderson, Austin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Tyneasia Barnes, #2 Exhibit Consent of Dean Dubose, #3 Exhibit Consent of Melissa Guenther, #4 Exhibit Consent of Lateesha Yarborough)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones re #7 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Consent Form Without Prejudice (Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Micheala Albright, #2 Exhibit Consent of Karisa Clark, #3 Exhibit Consent of Shaniece Collins, #4 Exhibit Consent of Laura Foster, #5 Exhibit Consent of Brandi Glast, #6 Exhibit Consent of DeShonna Lee, #7 Exhibit Consent of Rodney Norman, #8 Exhibit Consent of LeSean Robinson, #9 Exhibit Consent of Shelair Shields, #10 Exhibit Consent of Stephanie White, #11 Exhibit Consent of Chandra Williams, #12 Exhibit Consent of Desarea Williams)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Raven Adams-Mengo, Lexus Barton-Nelson, Senkentra Dickey, Idalmys Ferro, Shenisha Grant, Donna M. Hackshaw, Kiara Haynesworth, LaQuanna Kirton, Avonte Knight, Elica Loving, Ambar Maldonado, Yazmine Moore, Nikala Mumford, Alexis S. Nimmo, Quiana Phillips, Tyvann Pretlow, Dajuana Smith, Monique Tyson, John G. Walker, Lisa R. Wilkes, Chevaun Williams, Edwanda Williams, India Williams, Shyquilla Williams)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Stephanie M. Bannister, Vivian Brown, Wendy Carter, Mariah J. Cook, Courtney Cooper, Cassandra Crawford, Jerry Eckhardt, Jessica Fredricks, Kristianti Gibbs, Opeaya Grant Pierce, K'La Holloway, Maribeth Inductivo, Courtney Jacobs, Tanya Johnson, Nakitia Lambert, DeNae Lee, Deandrea Richmond, Olivia Robinson, Sherane Rose, Suprina Speller, Sabrina Renee Stancil, Toni Stevenson, Cortia Sweat, Justin Taylor, Krystal Trower)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/1/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3338209) by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Federal, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State)(Braddy, Lauren) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jessica Artis, Sharna Daniels, Melissa Duncan, Alethea Friday, Lance Gordon, Natalia Harris, Nicole Hill, Coreatha Holloway, Jamar R. Melvin, Jasmine Ridley, Kiara Smith, Yvonne Smith, Ali'ya Whitley, Jessica Wilkins, Tashekia Wooten)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 , #19 MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/30/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3337551) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - State, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Federal)(Shreves, Darin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3337336) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - State, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Federal)(Hulla, Patrick) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Additional Notice of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Bethellyn Barton, Quiana Bethune, Candice Jarrett, Tanisha Newsome)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAV VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/29/2020. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Non-Tennessee Workers for Lack of Jurisdiction by Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(B)(2) Motion to Partially Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A)(Mohammad, Yasmin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3336450) by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Alexander, William) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 21 Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 21 Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 3 Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 8 Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 48 Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing 7 Additional Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Danny Lynn Jones of Filing Consents to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50 Consent Forms)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3327391), filed by Danny Lynn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to PRA)(Yezbak, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lynn Jones
Represented By: Austin Anderson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Represented By: Charles Peter Yezbak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Darin Shreves
Represented By: Patrick Francis Hulla
Represented By: Yasmin A. Mohammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?