Doe et al v. Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd and James M. Boyd
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00408
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd. (Hawkins, Richard)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Extend The Deadline For Filing Reply Memorandum, to which Defendant consents, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file the reply memorandum in support of their Motion to Remand is modified so that any such filing is due by September 24,2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 9/24/2020. (epri, )
September 24, 2020 Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court set for 11/16/2020 at 10:30 AM via Norfolk Remote before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion by James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Richard)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd. (Hawkins, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Errata D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hawkins, Richard)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd. (Hawkins, Richard)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Hawkins, III on behalf of James M. Boyd, John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd (Hawkins, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion #7 is GRANTED; and further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including September 8, 2020 to respond to Anthem's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 08/19/2020. (bboy, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Anthem's Motion to Dismiss by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Massie)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Meyer, #2 Exhibit A to Meyer Declaration (the Plan))(Cooper, Massie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/12/2020) (bboy, ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to attorney Boyd RE: Registering to E-file.(epri, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7335692.), filed by Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Service of Process), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Massie)
August 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe, a Minor by his Next Friend, James M. Boyd
Represented By: James Matheson Boyd
Represented By: Richard F. Hawkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Boyd
Represented By: James Matheson Boyd
Represented By: Richard F. Hawkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Massie Payne Cooper
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?