Kia Motors America, Inc. v. Greenbrier GMC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Defendant: Atlantic VA, LLC, Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. doing business as Southern Kia Lynnhaven, John Doe Co. 2, Greenbrier GMC, Inc. doing business as Southern Kia Greenbrier, ACMGMT LLC, John Doe Co. 1 and Atlantic VA AG, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00428
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
October 13, 2020 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's Opposition to Atlantic VA AG LLC's and ACMGMT LLC's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
October 8, 2020 Filing 50 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Greenbrier GMC, Inc. and Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 47 Reply in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery #11 filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 30, 2020 Filing 46 Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #9 filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 28, 2020 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support re #43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 42 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 41 Declaration re #39 Memorandum in Opposition by ACMGMT LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 Declaration re #39 Memorandum in Opposition by Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Dougherty, Ryan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA AG, LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mytelka, Craig)
September 24, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mytelka, Craig)
September 24, 2020 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mytelka, Craig)
September 24, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Defendants Greenbrier GMC, Inc. d/b/a Southern Kia Greenbrier and Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. d/b/a Southern Kia Lynnhaven shall have up to and including September 24, 2020 in which to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to file their memoranda in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 09/21/2020. (bboy, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including September 28, 2020. Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is hereby extended up to and including September 28, 2020. Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery is hereby extended up to and including September 28, 2020; and the caption of this case shall be corrected so that the party identified as "Atlantic VA, LLC" shall hereafter be identified as "Atlantic VA AG, LLC." Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 9/17/20. (afar)
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint, #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Ryan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint, 29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mytelka, Craig)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to September 21, 2020. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 16, 2020.
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to September 21, 2020. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 16, 2020.
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Ryan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACMGMT LLC. (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mytelka, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Mackenzie Smith on behalf of Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. (Smith, Janet)
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Howard Brannon on behalf of Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. (Brannon, Clinton)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Filing 22 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Greenbrier GMC, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Lawrence Mytelka on behalf of Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. (Mytelka, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 Brief in Support to #19 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William Rueger Poynter on behalf of ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA, LLC (Poynter, William)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Van Patten Dougherty on behalf of ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA, LLC (Dougherty, Ryan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kia Motors America, Inc. Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kia Motors America, Inc. Greenbrier GMC, Inc. served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kia Motors America, Inc. Atlantic VA, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Connally, Nathaniel)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kia Motors America, Inc. ACMGMT LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020 (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Connally, Nathaniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connally, Nathaniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Connally, Nathaniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Connally, Nathaniel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to ACMGMT LLC, Atlantic VA, LLC, Greenbrier GMC, Inc., Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Trademark. (epri, )
August 20, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to ACMGMT, LLC by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Atlantic VA, LLC by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. d/b/a Southern Kia Lynnhaven by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Greenbrier GMC, Inc. d/b/a Southern Kia Greenbrier by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Connally, Nathaniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7361888.), filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G-1, #9 Exhibit G-2, #10 Exhibit G-3, #11 Exhibit G-4, #12 Exhibit G-5)(Connally, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kia Motors America, Inc. v. Greenbrier GMC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic VA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern of Lynnhaven, Inc. doing business as Southern Kia Lynnhaven
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Mytelka
Represented By: Clinton Howard Brannon
Represented By: Janet Mackenzie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Co. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier GMC, Inc. doing business as Southern Kia Greenbrier
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Mytelka
Represented By: Clinton Howard Brannon
Represented By: Janet Mackenzie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACMGMT LLC
Represented By: Ryan Van Patten Dougherty
Represented By: William Rueger Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Co. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic VA AG, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Van Patten Dougherty
Represented By: William Rueger Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Thomas Connally, III
Represented By: Thomas Bartholomew Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?