Jankowski v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Ligaya L. Jankowski, by Michael T. Jankowski, under Power of Attorney
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00530
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2680
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ligaya L. Jankowski, by Michael T. Jankowski, under Power of Attorney. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (U.S. Attorney General served on 11/2/2020) (Rawls, Brewster) Modified text on 11/20/2020 (tamarm, ).
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service re #1 Complaint, by Sean Douglas Jansen on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jansen, Sean)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney. General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons (US Attorney Norfolk) by Ligaya L. Jankowski, by Michael T. Jankowski, under Power of Attorney. (Rawls, Brewster)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons (US Attorney General) by Ligaya L. Jankowski, by Michael T. Jankowski, under Power of Attorney. (Rawls, Brewster)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons (US Attorney Norfolk) by Ligaya Jankowski. (Rawls, Brewster)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (US Attorney General) by Ligaya Jankowski. (Rawls, Brewster)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7463366.), filed by Ligaya Jankowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Power of Attorney, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Administrative Claim, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Expert Report of Dr. Charles J. Miller)(Rawls, Brewster)
October 26, 2020 Notice of Correction re 3 Proposed Summons, 2 Proposed Summons. Filing user has been directed to refile the Proposed Summonses as non-fillable pdf documents. (epri, )
October 26, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jankowski v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean Douglas Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ligaya L. Jankowski, by Michael T. Jankowski, under Power of Attorney
Represented By: Brewster Stone Rawls
Represented By: David Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?