Baust et al v. City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Plaintiff: Erik Svejda, Michael Brown, Kaleigh Zehr, Christopher West, Nicholas DiCaprio, David Baust, William Padgett and Elizabeth Beatty
Defendant: City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Case Number: 2:2020cv00595
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages filed by David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West, Kaleigh Zehr. (Coploff, Theodore)
January 22, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages by David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West, Kaleigh Zehr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coploff, Theodore)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 09:00 AM by conference call to be initiated by counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on January 5, 2021. (sche)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Martin Kurt on behalf of City of Virginia Beach, Virginia (Kurt, Joseph)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Boynton on behalf of City of Virginia Beach, Virginia (Boynton, Christopher)
December 28, 2020 Refer for 16(b) (clou )
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Virginia Beach, Virginia.(Harris, Gerald)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Svejda, Michael Brown, Christopher West, Elizabeth Beatty, Kaleigh Zehr, David Baust, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett City of Virginia Beach, Virginia served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 (Coploff, Theodore)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sarah Michelle Block as to David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West and Kaleigh Zehr. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 12/10/20. (tlev, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sara Lyn Faulman as to David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West and Kaleigh Zehr. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 12/10/20. (tlev, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Michelle Block and Certification of Local Counsel T. Reid Coploff by David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West, Kaleigh Zehr. (Coploff, Theodore)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Lyn Faulman and Certification of Local Counsel T. Reid Coploff by David Baust, Elizabeth Beatty, Michael Brown, Nicholas DiCaprio, William Padgett, Erik Svejda, Christopher West, Kaleigh Zehr. (Coploff, Theodore)
December 7, 2020 Notice of Correction re #5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Michelle Block and #4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Lyn Faulman and Certification of Local Counsel T. Reid Coploff. The motions do not match the docket entries regarding parties represented. Counsel should refile the motions with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay the fees a second time. (tlev, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Michelle Block and Certification of Local Counsel T. Reid Coploff Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7520984. by David Baust. (Coploff, Theodore)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Lyn Faulman and Certification of Local Counsel T. Reid Coploff Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7520953. by David Baust. (Coploff, Theodore)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Virginia Beach, Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 25, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to City of Virginia Beach, Virginia by David Baust. (Coploff, Theodore)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7514893.), filed by David Baust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coploff, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baust et al v. City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Svejda
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleigh Zehr
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher West
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas DiCaprio
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Baust
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Padgett
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Beatty
Represented By: Theodore Reid Coploff
Represented By: Sarah Michelle Block
Represented By: Sara Lyn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Represented By: Christopher Scott Boynton
Represented By: Gerald Logan Harris
Represented By: Joseph Martin Kurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?