Stiles v. Sandbridge Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tanya L Stiles
Defendant: Sandbridge Properties, LLC and Food Lion, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00643
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM remotely. (ptom, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller & filed on 2/5/21. (ptom, )
January 24, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim by Sandbridge Properties, LLC.(Lenhart, Randall)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bradon Childs on behalf of Food Lion, LLC (Childs, David)
January 8, 2021 Notice of Correction re 11 Notice of Appearance. Document number 11, is incorrectly saved as PDF fillable form which we have removed. Please refile the document after saving it correctly. (mrees, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bradon Childs on behalf of Food Lion, LLC (Childs, David)
January 5, 2021 Refer for 16(b) (mrees, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 CROSSCLAIM against Sandbridge Properties, LLC, filed by Food Lion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Warren, Jared) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (mrees, ).
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Food Lion, LLC.(Warren, Jared)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Food Lion, LLC. (Warren, Jared)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Food Lion, LLC of Consent to Removal (Warren, Jared)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah David Weisberg on behalf of Tanya L Stiles (Weisberg, Noah)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by George Gorman on behalf of Tanya L Stiles (Gorman, George)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sandbridge Properties, LLC. (epri, )
December 23, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sandbridge Properties, LLC. (Lenhart, Randall)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7557072.), filed by Sandbridge Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lenhart, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiles v. Sandbridge Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandbridge Properties, LLC
Represented By: Randall Clair Lenhart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Lion, LLC
Represented By: David Bradon Childs
Represented By: Jared Andrew Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya L Stiles
Represented By: Noah David Weisberg
Represented By: George Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?